Carrasco v. O'Sullivan et al

Plaintiff: Barbara Carrasco
Defendant: Laura H.G. O'Sullivan and McCabe, Weisberg & Company, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00403
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Dismissing complaint without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 3/14/2019. (c/m 3/15/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Barbara Carrasco (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion of plaintiff for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #2 Motion of plaintiff for TRO; Granting plaintiff 21 days from the date of this order to complete the USM forms and summons and return to the Clerk. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/13/2019. (c/m 2/13/19 as directed jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Barbara Carrasco(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Barbara Carrasco(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McCabe, Weisberg & Company, LLC, Laura H.G. O'Sullivan, filed by Barbara Carrasco. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carrasco v. O'Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Carrasco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laura H.G. O'Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McCabe, Weisberg & Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?