Shah v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: Roman Shah
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Greg L. Collett, Greg Collett, Acting Attorney Gene Matthew G. Whitaker, US Attorney for Dist Robert K Hur and L. Francis Cissna
Case Number: 1:2019cv00459
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1447
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 12, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roman Shah. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019.(Whitaker, Nicole)
April 12, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roman Shah. Robert K Hur served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019.(Whitaker, Nicole)
April 12, 2019 Filing 25 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roman Shah. Matthew G. Whitaker served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019.(Whitaker, Nicole)
April 12, 2019 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roman Shah. L. Francis Cissna served on 3/25/2019, answer due 4/15/2019.(Whitaker, Nicole)
April 12, 2019 Filing 23 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Roman Shah. Greg Collett served on 3/13/2019, answer due 4/3/2019.(Whitaker, Nicole)
April 11, 2019 Filing 22 QC NOTICE: #20 Affidavit of Service filed by Roman Shah, #21 Affidavit of Service filed by Roman Shah, #19 Affidavit of Service filed by Roman Shah, #18 Affidavit of Service filed by Roman Shah, #17 Affidavit of Service filed by Roman Shah was filed incorrectly. ***Please re-file documents by selecting Service of Process> Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 21 (FILED IN ERROR)AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on USCIS on March 13, 2019, filed by Roman Shah.(Whitaker, Nicole) Modified on 4/11/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
April 10, 2019 Filing 20 (FILED IN ERROR)AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Robert K. Hur on March 11, 2019, filed by Roman Shah.(Whitaker, Nicole) Modified on 4/11/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
April 10, 2019 Filing 19 (FILED IN ERROR)AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Matthew G. Whitaker on March 26, 2019, filed by Roman Shah.(Whitaker, Nicole) Modified on 4/11/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
April 10, 2019 Filing 18 (FILED IN ERROR)AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on L. Francis Cissna on March 25, 2019, filed by Roman Shah.(Whitaker, Nicole) Modified on 4/11/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
April 10, 2019 Filing 17 (FILED IN ERROR)AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Greg Collett on March 13, 2019, filed by Roman Shah.(Whitaker, Nicole) Modified on 4/11/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 3/19/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 13 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Please correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. **Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2019 Filing 12 (FILED IN ERROR-CLERICAL ERROR)NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 8 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Please correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/19/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
March 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 10 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Please correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. **Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Vickie LeDuc on behalf of All Defendants (LeDuc, Vickie)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 2/26/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Roman Shah or counsel for Roman Shah are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/12/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 60 days as to L. Francis Cissna, Greg Collett, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Roman Shah re #1 Complaint (Whitaker, Nicole)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Roman Shah re #1 Complaint (Whitaker, Nicole)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Roman Shah was filed incorrectly. ***The following attachments are missing - Summons. Whenever a federal agency is named as a defendant additional summons are required. Please provide summons for, U.S. Attorney for the District of Maryland and Attorney General of the United States.To correct this problem, file Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7843554.), filed by Roman Shah. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Whitaker, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shah v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director L. Francis Cissna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg L. Collett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Collett
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Attorney Gene Matthew G. Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Attorney for Dist Robert K Hur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Francis Cissna
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roman Shah
Represented By: Nicole Marie Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?