Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. S & K Business Associates et al

Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Soo Mi Kang, S & K Business Associates and S & K Business Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00465
Filed: February 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Soo Mi Kang served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019; S & K Business Associates, Inc. served on 2/19/2019, answer due 3/12/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Hollimon, Justin)
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 QC NOTICE re: Disclosure of Financial Interest filed as "Supplement" Attachment #2 to #1 Complaint by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. was filed incorrectly ** Please re-file as a separate entry using the event "Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement" found in "Other Filings" in the category "Other Documents". The Supplement Attachment #2 only has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link for Attachment #2 only has been disabled. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Soo Mi Kang, S & K Business Associates, Inc.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
February 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7844063.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 (FILED IN ERROR) Supplement, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Hollimon, Justin) Modified on 2/19/2019 (dass, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. S & K Business Associates et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soo Mi Kang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S & K Business Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S & K Business Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Michael Hollimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?