Sutton v. State of Maryland Department of Human Services

Plaintiff: Cassandra Sutton
Defendant: State of Maryland Department of Human Services
Consolidated Defendant: AAG Elise Song Kurlander and Brian E. Frosh, Esquire
Consolidated Plaintiff: Corlie McCormick, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00542
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2019 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Cassandra Sutton.(McCormick, Corlie)
March 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/14/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Complaint by Cassandra Sutton (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(McCormick, Corlie)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Remand to State Court Defendant's Opposition to Motion to Remand filed by State of Maryland Department of Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurlander, Elise)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Complaint by State of Maryland Department of Human Services (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurlander, Elise)
February 28, 2019 Filing 12 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's proposed Order to Judge to Dismiss Counts III & IV of Complaint by State of Maryland Department of Human Services (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kurlander, Elise) Modified on 3/1/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's EXHIBIT A to Memorandum in Support of Dismissal by State of Maryland Department of Human Services (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Kurlander, Elise) Modified on 3/1/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #8 Motion to Dismiss filed by State of Maryland Department of Human Services, #9 Motion to Dismiss filed by State of Maryland Department of Human Services was filed incorrectly. **A motion, supporting memorandum, exhibits, and proposed order must be filed as one entry. The motion should be filed as the main document with the supporting memorandum, exhibits, and proposed order as separate attachments to the main document. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Counts III & IV of Complaint by State of Maryland Department of Human Services(Kurlander, Elise) Modified on 2/28/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
February 28, 2019 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Dismiss Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Complaint by State of Maryland Department of Human Services(Kurlander, Elise) Modified on 2/28/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
February 28, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by State of Maryland Department of Human Services (Kurlander, Elise)
February 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by State of Maryland Department of Human Services Statement Concerning Notice of Removal (Kurlander, Elise)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Cassandra Sutton (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Mem. in Support of Mot. to Remand, #2 Exhibit Ex. 1, Complaint (w. Cover sheet and RTS), #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(McCormick, Corlie)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Cassandra Sutton (McCormick, Corlie)
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 2/22/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: [1-3] Local Rule 103.5 was filed incorrectly. **Please refile exhibit B to the removal as a separate filing under the "Other Documents" category, select the "Local Rule" event and enter 103.5(a) Certification. Exhibit B has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-18-007031 OT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7850133), filed by Elise Song Kurlander. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A Complaint/Summons #3 (FILED IN ERROR) Exhibit B)(Kurlander, Elise) Modified on 2/22/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sutton v. State of Maryland Department of Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: AAG Elise Song Kurlander
Represented By: Elise Song Kurlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: Brian E. Frosh, Esquire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland Department of Human Services
Represented By: Elise Song Kurlander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Sutton
Represented By: Corlie McCormick, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated plaintiff: Corlie McCormick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?