Williams v. Hanlon et al

Plaintiff: Lamar A. Williams
Defendant: Beverly Griffith, Bryan K. Forman, Helen Donovan, Kenneth M. Langston, James K. Bredar, David Lutz, Rebecca S. Talbott, J. Mark Coulson, Michael C. Hanlon, Stephanie A. Gallagher, Patricia Connor, Stephanie Vassar, Roger L. Gregory, Robert K. Hur and Lauren M. Elfner
Case Number: 1:2019cv00550
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott L Sroka, Sr on behalf of J. Mark Coulson, Stephanie A. Gallagher (Sroka, Scott)
April 18, 2019 Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial(slss, Deputy Clerk)
April 18, 2019 Filing 19 USCA Case Number 19-6517 for #17 Notice of Appeal, filed by Lamar A. Williams. Case Manager - Cathy Poulsen (slss, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2019 Filing 18 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #17 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #16 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Change Venue, #15 Memorandum Opinion by Lamar A. Williams. (Fee Status: Filing Fee Not Paid)(slss, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Denying #11 Motion for Exigent Rule 20 Permissive Joinder of the Maryland Department of Human Services, John Barton & Seventy Time Seven/Elysian Fields as Defendants; Denying #12 Exigent Motion to Change Venue for Change of Venue Demand for Hearing; Denying #13 Amended Exigent Motion for Change of Venue Demand; Dismissing Complaint without prejudice as to Hanlon, Hur, Gallagher, Coulson, Langston, Dinivan, Elfner, Forman, Talbott, Griffith, Bredar, Gregory, Connor, Vassar and Lutz. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/15/2019. (c/m 4/15/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/15/2019. (c/m 4/15/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 Supplement to #11 MOTION for Exigent Rule 20 Permissive Joinder of the Maryland Department of Human Services, John Barton & Seventy Time Seven/Elysian Fields as Defendants filed by Lamar A. Williams (bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 AMENDED EXIGENT MOTION for Change of Venue Demand for Hearing by Lamar A. Williams. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2019 Filing 12 EXIGENT MOTION for Change of Venue Demand for Hearing by Lamar A. Williams(bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Exigent Rule 20 Permissive Joinder of the Maryland Department of Human Services, John Barton & Seventy Time Seven/Elysian Fields as Defendants by Lamar A. Williams(bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2019 Filing 10 Amended Relief Supplement to #1 Complaint, filed by Lamar A. Williams (bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lamar A. Williams(bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; Granting plaintiff 21 days to pay the full civil filing fee of $400 or file a completed IFP Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 3/15/2019. (c/m 3/15/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 Amended Supplement to #1 Complaint, filed by Lamar A. Williams (bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 6 Supplement to #1 Complaint, filed by Lamar A. Williams (Attachments: #1 Attachment I, #2 Attachment II, #3 Attachment III)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 2/25/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Lamar A. Williams or counsel for Lamar A. Williams are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/11/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Lamar A. Williams. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lamar A. Williams(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Jury Trial Demand by Lamar A. Williams(bas, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James K. Bredar, Patricia Connor, J. Mark Coulson, Helen Donovan, Lauren M. Elfner, Bryan K. Forman, Stephanie A. Gallagher, Roger L. Gregory, Beverly Griffith, Michael C. Hanlon, Robert K. Hur, Kenneth M. Langston, David Lutz, Rebecca S. Talbott, Stephanie Vassar, filed by Lamar A. Williams. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. Hanlon et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamar A. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beverly Griffith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan K. Forman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Donovan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth M. Langston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James K. Bredar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Lutz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca S. Talbott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Mark Coulson
Represented By: Scott L Sroka, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael C. Hanlon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie A. Gallagher
Represented By: Scott L Sroka, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Vassar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roger L. Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert K. Hur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lauren M. Elfner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?