Greene v. State Of Maryland et al
Plaintiff: Lauren Greene
Defendant: State Of Maryland and University of Maryland Baltimore Washington Medical Center
Case Number: 1:2019cv00553
Filed: February 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Lauren Greene (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT without prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/25/2019. (c/m 2/26/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 2/25/2019. (c/m 2/26/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
February 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. Judge George Levi Russell, III no longer assigned to the case. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
February 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against State Of Maryland, University of Maryland Baltimore Washington Medical Center, filed by Lauren Greene. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(ds3, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene v. State Of Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Of Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Maryland Baltimore Washington Medical Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Greene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?