OceanConnect Marine DMCC v. Nordia Bulk A/S Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: OceanConnect Marine DMCC
Defendant: Dina Shipping SA and Nordia Bulk A/S Ltd.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00639
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Referring Judge: Beth P Gesner
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30304
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dina Shipping SA identifying Other Affiliate Alma Shipmanagement and Trading, S.A. for Dina Shipping SA.(Bartlett, James)
April 19, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dina Shipping SA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Moysoglou, #3 Exhibit A to Moysoglou Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Moysoglou Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Moysoglou Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Moysoglou Declaration, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(Shaukat, Imran)
April 12, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OceanConnect Marine DMCC. OceanConnect Marine DMCC served on 3/29/2019, answer due 4/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Confirmation of receipt)(Simms, J)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Nordia Bulk A/S Ltd. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 4.1.19)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Nordia Bulk A/S Ltd. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense Against Nordia Bulk A/S Ltd by OceanConnect Marine DMCC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Clerk's Default)(Simms, J)
April 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by OceanConnect Marine DMCC. Nordia Bulk A/S Ltd. served on 3/8/2019, answer due 3/29/2019. (Attachments: #1 Confirmation of receipt)(Simms, J)
March 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 7 Please correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, declination forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/19/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
March 18, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #6 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 3/18/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER directing OceanConnect Marine DMCC to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 4/26/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if OceanConnect Marine DMCC files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 3/18/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 2/28/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. OceanConnect Marine DMCC or counsel for OceanConnect Marine DMCC are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 3/14/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 28, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Dina Shipping SA, Nordia Bulk A/S Ltd. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by OceanConnect Marine DMCC identifying Corporate Parent Glencore Plc for OceanConnect Marine DMCC.(Simms, J)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7863082.), filed by OceanConnect Marine DMCC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Dina Shipping, #3 Summons Nordea Bulk)(Simms, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: OceanConnect Marine DMCC v. Nordia Bulk A/S Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dina Shipping SA
Represented By: Imran O Shaukat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordia Bulk A/S Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OceanConnect Marine DMCC
Represented By: J Stephen Simms
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?