LaFontaine v. Dann Marine Towing, LC
Plaintiff: Jeffrey LaFontaine
Defendant: Dann Marine Towing, LC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00658
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dann Marine Towing, LC, filed by Jeffrey LaFontaine. (Attachments: #1 Redline)(krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MARGINAL ORDER approving #12 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint; denying as moot #11 Motion to Dismiss; reminding counsel to submit a proposed order with each motion. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/22/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend/Correct #1 Complaint by Jeffrey LaFontaine (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint, #2 Red-Lined Complaint)(West, John)
April 8, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimas to Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint by Dann Marine Towing, LC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Giles, Alexander)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MARGINAL ORDER approving #9 Unopposed Request for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/2/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Other Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Dann Marine Towing, LC(Giles, Alexander)
March 15, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeffrey LaFontaine. Dann Marine Towing, LC served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit, #2 Errata Exhibit B to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Affidavit)(West, John)
March 15, 2019 Filing 7 QC NOTICE: #6 Affidavit of Service, filed by Jeffrey LaFontaine was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event used. Refile using the event "Summons returned executed" and enter the dates of service when prompted by the system. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
March 14, 2019 Filing 6 [FILED IN ERROR] AFFIDAVIT of Service for Certified Mail/Return Receipt served on Resident Agent for Dann Marine Towing, LC on 03/11/2019, filed by Jeffrey LaFontaine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Affidavit, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Affidavit)(West, John) Modified on 3/15/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Dann Marine Towing, LC.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/7/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Jeffrey LaFontaine re #1 Complaint Summons Linked to Complaint (West, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jeffrey LaFontaine(West, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Dann Marine Towing, LC, filed by Jeffrey LaFontaine. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(West, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaFontaine v. Dann Marine Towing, LC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey LaFontaine
Represented By: John H West, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dann Marine Towing, LC
Represented By: Alexander M Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?