Sawyer et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Kathleen Sawyer, Kaylie Sawyer, Stephanie Wiggins and Colin Sawyer
Defendant: Anthony Amoroso, M.D., Daniel Lerman, M.D., University of Maryland Medical Center, LLC, United States of America, Preeti John, M.D. and Rakhi Goel, M.D.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00668
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2671
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Sawyer. United States of America served on 4/12/2019, answer due 6/11/2019.(Marder, Laurence)
April 30, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Sawyer. United States of America served on 4/11/2019, answer due 6/10/2019.(Marder, Laurence)
April 30, 2019 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #9 Summons Returned Executed filed by Kathleen Sawyer, #8 Summons Returned Executed filed by Kathleen Sawyer was filed incorrectly. **Refile using the proper event, "Summons returned executed as to USA." It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Sawyer. Anthony Amoroso, M.D. served on 4/23/2019, answer due 5/14/2019.(Marder, Laurence)
April 30, 2019 Filing 9 [FILED IN ERROR] SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Sawyer. United States of America served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019.(Marder, Laurence) Modified on 4/30/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 [FILED IN ERROR] SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kathleen Sawyer. United States of America served on 4/11/2019, answer due 5/2/2019.(Marder, Laurence) Modified on 4/30/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
April 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kaitlan Marie Skrainar on behalf of Daniel Lerman, M.D., University of Maryland Medical Center, LLC (Skrainar, Kaitlan)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Daniel Lerman, M.D., University of Maryland Medical Center, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Maryland Medicine Comprehensive Insurance Program for Daniel Lerman, M.D., University of Maryland Medical Center, LLC.(Brown, Neal)
April 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by University of Maryland Medical Center, LLC.(Brown, Neal)
April 8, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Daniel Lerman, M.D..(Brown, Neal)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Anthony Amoroso, M.D., Rakhi Goel, M.D., Preeti John, M.D., Daniel Lerman, M.D., University of Maryland Medical Center, LLC.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 60 days as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7869807.), filed by Stephanie Wiggins, Kaylie Sawyer, Kathleen Sawyer, Colin Sawyer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons)(Marder, Laurence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sawyer et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Sawyer
Represented By: Laurence A Marder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kaylie Sawyer
Represented By: Laurence A Marder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Wiggins
Represented By: Laurence A Marder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colin Sawyer
Represented By: Laurence A Marder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Amoroso, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Lerman, M.D.
Represented By: Neal Mullan Brown
Represented By: Kaitlan Marie Skrainar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of Maryland Medical Center, LLC
Represented By: Neal Mullan Brown
Represented By: Kaitlan Marie Skrainar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Preeti John, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rakhi Goel, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?