Ghee v. Hayat et al

Plaintiff: Octavia Evette Ghee
Defendant: Curtis Gillman and Hassan Hayat
Case Number: 1:2019cv00674
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting Plaintiff twenty-one days from the date of this order to complete the Marshal form and return to Clerk. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 USM 285 form) (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Curtis Gillman. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Hassan Hayat served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued 21 days as to Curtis Gillman, Hassan Hayat. (Attachments: #1 USMS Forms)(dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to #5 Order filed by Octavia Evette Ghee re USMS forms filed for each Defendant along with service copies. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Octavia Evette Ghee. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; granting plaintiff 21 days from the date of this order to complete USM forms and return to Clerk and provide service copies. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/25/2019. (c/m 3/25/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Octavia Evette Ghee. (dass, Deputy Clerk)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Motion of plaintiff for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting plaintiff 21 days from the date of this Order to pay the full civil filing fee of $400 or file an amended Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 3/5/2019. (c/m 3/5/19 jnls, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Octavia Evette Ghee.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Curtis Gillman, Hassan Hayat, filed by Octavia Evette Ghee. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 Right to Sue Letter, #2 Attachment 2 Pay Stubs, #3 Attachment 3 Misc Documents, #4 Summons, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(slss, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghee v. Hayat et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Octavia Evette Ghee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Curtis Gillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hassan Hayat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?