Johnson v. Baltimore Police Department et al

Plaintiff: Jerome L Johnson
Defendant: Frank Barlow, Baltimore Police Department, Daniel Boone, Gerald Goldstein and Kevin Davis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00698
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Avi Kamionski on behalf of Frank Barlow, Daniel Boone (Kamionski, Avi)
March 29, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jerome L Johnson. Daniel Boone waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019.(Lalchandani, Neel)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jerome L Johnson. Frank Barlow waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019.(Lalchandani, Neel)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jerome L Johnson. Kevin Davis waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019.(Lalchandani, Neel)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jerome L Johnson. Baltimore Police Department waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019.(Lalchandani, Neel)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Avi Kamionski on behalf of Gerald Goldstein (Kamionski, Avi)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jerome L Johnson. Gerald Goldstein waiver sent on 3/14/2019, answer due 5/13/2019.(Lalchandani, Neel)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shneur Zalman Nathan on behalf of Gerald Goldstein (Nathan, Shneur)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kara K Lynch on behalf of Baltimore Police Department (Lynch, Kara)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisabeth Walden on behalf of Baltimore Police Department (Walden, Elisabeth)
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Natalie Rose Amato on behalf of Baltimore Police Department (Amato, Natalie)
March 7, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Baltimore Police Department, Frank Barlow, Daniel Boone, Kevin Davis, Gerald Goldstein.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7875932.), filed by Jerome L Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Baltimore Police Department, #3 Summons Kevin Davis, #4 Summons Frank Barlow, #5 Summons Daniel Boone, #6 Summons Gerald Goldstein)(Flowers, Kobie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Baltimore Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Barlow
Represented By: Avi Kamionski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baltimore Police Department
Represented By: Kara K Lynch
Represented By: Natalie Rose Amato
Represented By: Elisabeth Walden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Boone
Represented By: Avi Kamionski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerald Goldstein
Represented By: Shneur Zalman Nathan
Represented By: Avi Kamionski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerome L Johnson
Represented By: Abigail Graber
Represented By: Kobie Flowers
Represented By: Andrew D Levy
Represented By: Neel Lalchandani
Represented By: Andrew David Freeman
Represented By: Nancy S Forster
Represented By: Joshua R Treem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?