Spell v. Wright et al

Plaintiff: Julius L. Spell
Defendant: Nate Nuty, Deon Wright, Nate Duty, Barvo Jones, Adam Martin, Wellington Bruce Ashe, Sharon Johnson and Wellington Bruce Ash
Case Number: 1:2019cv00722
Filed: March 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981cv
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 12 Correspondence from Julius L. Spell re: Request for case to be heard and at proper time request representation be granted. (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 Supplemental to #10 Amended Complaint filed by Julius L. Spell (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
April 15, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Deon Wright, Wellington Bruce Ash filed by Julius L. Spell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2019 Filing 9 Correspondence from Julius Spell. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2019 Filing 8 Correspondence from Julius Spell. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence from Julius Spell. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 Correspondence from Julius Spell re: Pro Bono Counsel.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2019 Filing 5 Correspondence from Julius L. Spell re: supplemental documents.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Plaintiff 28 days to file an Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 3/19/2019. (c/m w/forms 3/19/19 bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Julius L. Spell(ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Julius L. Spell(ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Wellington Bruce Ashe, Sharon Johnson, Barvo Jones, Adam Martin, Nate Nuty, Deon Wright, filed by Julius L. Spell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spell v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Nuty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deon Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nate Duty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barvo Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellington Bruce Ashe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wellington Bruce Ash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julius L. Spell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?