Osowiecki v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Plaintiff: Henry Osowiecki
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00819
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Henry Osowiecki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff declaration, #2 Exhibit CPFB amicus brief Bender, #3 Exhibit State court foreclosure filing, #4 Exhibit Bullock opinion)(Anderson, Rex)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #4 Text of Proposed Order)(Buzzetta, Walter)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Other Affiliate Ocwen Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate Ocwen Mortgage Servicing, Inc. for Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(Buzzetta, Walter)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Buzzetta on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Buzzetta, Walter)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 6/10/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Troost, John)
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Attorney Rex C. Anderson will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 6/4/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rex C Anderson (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8048463.) by Henry Osowiecki(Baney, Nathan)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC , filed by Henry Osowiecki. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Baney, Nathan) Modified on 5/10/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
March 19, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7896668.), filed by Henry Osowiecki. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Baney, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osowiecki v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: John Thomas Troost
Represented By: Walter Buzzetta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Osowiecki
Represented By: Nathan D Baney, Baney
Represented By: Rex C Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?