McCormack v. Elmore & Throop, P.C.

Plaintiff: Matthew L. McCormack
Defendant: Elmore & Throop, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00837
Filed: March 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MARGINAL ORDER approving #4 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Matthew L. McCormack. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/8/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Matthew L. McCormack(Baney, Nathan)
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Elmore & Throop, P.C. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Vander Woude, John)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Elmore & Throop, P.C..(krs, Deputy Clerk)
March 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Elmore & Throop, P.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7899893.), filed by Matthew L. McCormack. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Baney, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCormack v. Elmore & Throop, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew L. McCormack
Represented By: Nathan D Baney, Baney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elmore & Throop, P.C.
Represented By: John S Vander Woude
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?