Lee v. The Terminal Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Gavin Lee and Gavin A. Lee
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation and The Terminal Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00852
Filed: March 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER staying all litigation and Scheduling Order deadlines pending the settlement conference. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/29/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 25, 2019 Filing 26 Correspondence re: Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Castelli, Alexander)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite on 4/24/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite for Settlement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/24/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2019 Telephone Status Conference held on 4/23/2019 before Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2019 Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #22 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Leslie V Maffeo. Directing attorney Leslie V Maffeo to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 4/22/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
April 22, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Leslie V. Maffeo (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7966049.) by Northrop Grumman Corporation(Grossenbacher, Karla)
April 16, 2019 Filing 21 Correspondence re: Deadline for requests for modification of initial Scheduling Order be extended to April 23, 2019 in (Castelli, Alexander)
April 15, 2019 Filing 20 Correspondence re: Regarding Plaintiff's Request to Modify Scheduling Order (Stolarz, John)
April 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 PAPERLESS ORDER. At the request of counsel for the parties, the telephone conference scheduled for April 16, 2019, has been rescheduled to April 23, 2019, at 4:00 p.m. Counsel for plaintiff is to initiate the call to defense counsel and then to chambers. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/3/2019. (kw, Chambers)
April 2, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gavin A. Lee. The Terminal Corporation waiver sent on 4/1/2019, answer due 5/31/2019.(Stolarz, John)
April 1, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Terminal Corporation (Shawe, Stephen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal DEFENDANT THE TERMINAL CORPORATION'S CONSENT TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL AND STATEMENT TO STANDING ORDER CONCERNING REMOVAL filed by The Terminal Corporation.(Shawe, Stephen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Ivan Castelli on behalf of The Terminal Corporation (Castelli, Alexander)
April 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Parker Thoeni on behalf of The Terminal Corporation (Thoeni, Parker)
April 1, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen D Shawe on behalf of The Terminal Corporation (Shawe, Stephen)
April 1, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM to Counsel setting a conference call to discuss the appropriate schedule in this case. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 4/1/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 29, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Northrop Grumman Corporation identifying Other Affiliate State Street Bank and Trust Company, Other Affiliate Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation for Northrop Grumman Corporation.(Grossenbacher, Karla)
March 28, 2019 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement filed by Northrop Grumman Corporation was filed incorrectly. **The Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement needs to be refiled and the corporate parent and/or affiliations need to be entered when the system prompts you. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Northrop Grumman Corporation Statement Concerning Standing Order on Removal (Grossenbacher, Karla)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Northrop Grumman Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation for Northrop Grumman Corporation.(Grossenbacher, Karla) Modified on 3/28/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by Northrop Grumman Corporation.(Grossenbacher, Karla)
March 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 3/22/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2 thru 5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gavin A. Lee. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Northrop Grumman Corporation.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Northrop Grumman Corporation, The Terminal Corporation, filed by Gavin A. Lee.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Northrop Grumman Corporation, The Terminal Corporation, filed by Gavin A. Lee.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-c-19-000362-OT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7904870), filed by Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Complaint, #3 Amended Complaint, #4 Service Process, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Grossenbacher, Karla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. The Terminal Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Karla Grossenbacher
Represented By: Leslie V Maffeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Terminal Corporation
Represented By: Stephen D Shawe
Represented By: Alexander Ivan Castelli
Represented By: Parker Thoeni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gavin A. Lee
Represented By: John B Stolarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?