Lewis v. Aetna Life Insruance Company et al
Plaintiff: Brittany L Lewis
Defendant: LJT & Associates, Inc., LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan and Aetna Life Insruance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00860
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by LJT & Associates, Inc., LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Reply Memorandum)(Stein, Wendy)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting #23 Motion to Withdraw Appearance. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/20/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 QC NOTICE: #24 Response in Support of Motion, filed by LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan, LJT & Associates, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **Please refile using the event under Responses and Replies - Reply to Response to Motion. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 -[FILED IN ERROR]- RESPONSE in Support re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Reply and Reply Memorandum filed by LJT & Associates, Inc., LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Reply Memorandum)(Stein, Wendy) Modified on 6/20/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk).
June 18, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Withdraw Appearances of Raymond C. Baldwin and Christine M. Costantino by LJT & Associates, Inc., LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Raymond)
June 5, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Brittany L Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Opposition)(Cockey, Robin)
May 28, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint by LJT & Associates, Inc., LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stein, Wendy)
May 28, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Wendy J. Stein on behalf of LJT & Associates, Inc., LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan (Stein, Wendy)
May 23, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimCount II of the Complaint filed by Aetna Life Insruance Company. (Attachments: #1 Unreported Case -- Sanders v. Hartford)(Mullen, Kathleen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimCount II of the Complaint filed by Brittany L Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support of Opposition)(Cockey, Robin)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer LJT & Associates, Inc. answer due 5/28/2019; LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan answer due 5/28/2019.. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/8/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, or Otherwise Respond by LJT & Associates, Inc., LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Raymond)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/1/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2019 Filing 14 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by LJT & Associates, Inc., LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Raymond)
April 30, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a ClaimCount II of the Complaint by Aetna Life Insruance Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit Table of Exhibits, Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Appendix of Unreported Cases)(Mullen, Kathleen)
April 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer LJT & Associates, Inc. answer due 4/30/2019; LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan answer due 4/30/2019.. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/17/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Christine M Costantino on behalf of LJT & Associates, Inc., LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan (Costantino, Christine)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by LJT & Associates, Inc., LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baldwin, Raymond)
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MARGINAL ORDER Approving #8 Stipulation Regarding Time to Respond to Complaint filed by Aetna Life Insruance Company. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 4/11/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 11, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, Regarding Time to Respond to Complaint by Aetna Life Insruance Company(Mullen, Kathleen)
April 11, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insruance Company identifying Corporate Parent Aetna Inc. for Aetna Life Insruance Company.(Mullen, Kathleen)
April 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen Ann Mullen on behalf of Aetna Life Insruance Company (Mullen, Kathleen)
April 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany L Lewis. LJT & Associates, Inc. served on 3/28/2019, answer due 4/18/2019.(Cockey, Robin)
April 2, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany L Lewis. LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019.(Cockey, Robin)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brittany L Lewis. Aetna Life Insruance Company served on 3/26/2019, answer due 4/16/2019.(Cockey, Robin)
March 25, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Aetna Life Insruance Company, LJT & Associates, Inc., LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7907903.), filed by Brittany L Lewis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Line, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Aetna, #5 Summons LJT & Associates, Inc., #6 Summons LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan)(Cockey, Robin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lewis v. Aetna Life Insruance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LJT & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy J. Stein
Represented By: Raymond C Baldwin
Represented By: Christine M Costantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LJT & Associates, Inc. Welfare Plan
Represented By: Wendy J. Stein
Represented By: Raymond C Baldwin
Represented By: Christine M Costantino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insruance Company
Represented By: Kathleen Ann Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brittany L Lewis
Represented By: Robin R Cockey
Represented By: Ashley Ann Bosche
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?