Raftery v. The Johns Hopkins Hospital et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Dennis Raftery and Carinda Raftery
Defendant: The Johns Hopkins Hospital, The American National Red Cross and American National Red Cross
Case Number: 1:2019cv00869
Filed: March 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Filing 17 FILED IN ERROR IN MEMBER CASE - RESPONSE in Opposition re (18 in 1:19-cv-00867-DKC) MOTION for Extension of Time to File The Certificate of Qualified Expert and Report filed by The Johns Hopkins Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00867-DKC, 1:19-cv-00869-DKC(Nesbitt, Kristen) Modified on 5/22/2019 (cags, Deputy Clerk).
April 19, 2019 THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (19-cv-867-DKC). (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2019 Cases associated: Create association to 1:19-cv-00867-DKC. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Consolidate Cases; Directing cases are consolidated for all purposes under Civil Action No. DKC 19-0867; Directing Clerk to re-file the notice of removal, complaint, and answers in Civil Action No. DKC 19-0869 (ECF Nos. 1, 2, 13, and 14, respectively) in Civil Action No. DKC 19-0867; Administratively Closing Civil Action No. DKC 19-0869.. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 4/19/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 4, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by The Johns Hopkins Hospital.(Chrencik, Lucas)
March 29, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #2 Complaint (Statement of Claim) by The Johns Hopkins Hospital.(Chrencik, Lucas)
March 29, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #2 Complaint by American National Red Cross.(McSherry, M)
March 28, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. Judge George Levi Russell, III no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
March 27, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.5 (a) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit HCADRO-Amended Statement of Claim)(McSherry, M)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by The Johns Hopkins Hospital identifying Corporate Parent The Johns Hopkins Health System Corporation for The Johns Hopkins Hospital.(Chrencik, Lucas)
March 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases - Motion for Consolidation by American National Red Cross (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(McSherry, M)
March 26, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal - American National Red Cross Response to Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by American National Red Cross.(McSherry, M)
March 26, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by American National Red Cross (McSherry, M)
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE re #1 Notice of Removal, Line Joining Removal of American National Red Cross filed by The Johns Hopkins Hospital.(Nesbitt, Kristen)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 3/25/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 25, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.5(a) by American National Red Cross(kos, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2 thru 4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE HEALTH CARE ALTERNATIVE DISPUTE RESOLUTION OFFICE. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 Claimant's NOTICE to Take Corporate Designee Deposition by Carinda Raftery (kos, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American National Red Cross.(kos, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT (Statement of Claim) against American National Red Cross, The Johns Hopkins Hospital, filed by Carinda Raftery. (Attachments: #1 Claim Form)(kos, Deputy Clerk)
March 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Health Care Alternative Dispute Resolution Office Of Maryland, case number 2019-065. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7909456), filed by The American National Red Cross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(McSherry, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raftery v. The Johns Hopkins Hospital et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Johns Hopkins Hospital
Represented By: Lucas W B Chrencik
Represented By: Kristen Nichole Nesbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The American National Red Cross
Represented By: M Natalie McSherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Red Cross
Represented By: M Natalie McSherry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Dennis Raftery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carinda Raftery
Represented By: Paul D Bekman
Represented By: Aaron L Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?