Fondren v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Charles M. Fondren
Defendant: John Doe's, 1-5, Smith & Nephew p.l.c., Greenwood Leflore Hospital, Smith & Nephew Inc. and Patrick Davis
Case Number: 1:2019cv00998
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2019 Filing 21 STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for April 10, 2019 Discovery Call and Status Update on Depositions and Case-Specific Discovery Process Discussions by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 20 -SEALED-RESPONSE in Opposition re (1475 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Compel Discovery filed Ex Parte filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Errata E, #6 Exhibit F)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to File Unredacted Opposition to Plaintiffs' Letter Motion to Compel Production of Discovery Ex Parte by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re (1475 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara)
April 5, 2019 Filing 17 Case transferred in from District of Mississippi Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-00256. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 TRANSFER ORDER that action is transferred to District of Maryland (tab)
February 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Smith & Newphew Inc.'s Supplemental Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Multidistrict Litigation Transfer Order (Kemp)) (Cassisa, Paul) Modified on 3/29/2019 (jla).
January 11, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum and Order in Kemp v. S&N, et al.) (Cassisa, Paul)
January 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 AGREED ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR SMITH & NEPHEW, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/8/19. (cs)
January 2, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tommie Gregory Williams, Jr on behalf of Greenwood Leflore Hospital (Williams, Tommie)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER finding as moot #3 Motion to Stay per #10 Order Staying Case due to Motion to Remand. No further written order will issue from the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/2/19. (cs) Modified on 1/7/2019 (jla).
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING CASE due to #7 Motion to Remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 1/2/19. (cs)
December 31, 2018 Filing 9 STATE COURT RECORD - REMOVAL. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket Page, #2 Civil Cover Sheet State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #3 State Court Complaint State Court Complaint, #4 Summons Summosn to CT for Smith & Nephew, Inc., #5 Summons Summons to Smith & Nephew, PLC, #6 Summons Summons to Greenwood Leflore Hospital, #7 Summons Summons to Patrick Davis, #8 Exhibit Proof of Service of Summons to Greenwood Leflore Hospital, #9 Exhibit Entry of Appearance and Notice of Intent to Defend of Greenwood Leflore Hospital, #10 Exhibit Notice and Motion to Dismiss of Greenwood Leflore Hospital, #11 Exhibit Notice and Motion for Protective Order of Greenwood Leflore Hospital, #12 Exhibit Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, #13 Exhibit Agreed Order Extending Time to Respond, #14 Summons Proof of Service of Summons to Smith & Nephew, Inc., #15 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Greenwood Leflore Hospital's Motion to Dismiss, #16 Affidavit Affidavit of Charles Fondren) (Cassisa, Paul)
December 28, 2018 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Charles M. Fondren. (Cory, Michael)
December 28, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Charles M. Fondren. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Chart-Stik Related to Plaintiffs Implantation Surgery dated November 4, 2010, #2 Exhibit Notice from Plfs Counsel to Jim Jackson) (Cory, Michael)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #5 Response in Opposition to Motion to Stay re #3 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 filed by Charles M. Fondren. (Cory, Michael) Modified on 1/7/2019 (jla).
December 28, 2018 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 filed by Charles M. Fondren. (Cory, Michael)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #3 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Denying Remand) (Cassisa, Paul)
December 27, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL 2775 by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Cassisa, Paul)
December 27, 2018 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Brown and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
December 27, 2018 Filing 2 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Charles M. Fondren. (jla)
December 27, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Smith & Nephew, Inc. from Leflore County Circuit Court, case number 2018-0053-CICI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0537-1628963) Pursuant to Local Uniform Civil Rule 5(b) and the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing for the Northern District of Mississippi, the removing defendant must electronically file a copy of the entire state court record within 14 days of the date of removal. The state court record will be filed using the event State Court Record - Removal. Attach the Notice/Certificate of Filing State Court Record as the main document with each state court document attached as a separate PDF. All attachments must be clearly identified. The state court record can not be filed conventionally., filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Service of Process Sheet and Summons, #3 Exhibit C - State Court File, #4 Exhibit D - Signed Declaration of P. Davis, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (jla)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fondren v. Smith & Nephew, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe's, 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew p.l.c.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenwood Leflore Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith & Nephew Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles M. Fondren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?