Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Huynh et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Viet Pearl, LLC and Phoung Anh Huynh
Case Number: 1:2019cv01075
Filed: April 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Set Aside Default by Phoung Anh Huynh, Viet Pearl, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 (Insurer Rejection of Claim))(Day, Sean)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Phoung Anh Huynh, Viet Pearl, LLC (Day, Sean)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Sean Robert Day on behalf of Phoung Anh Huynh, Viet Pearl, LLC (Day, Sean)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Viet Pearl, LLC (c/m 6/12/2019 tds, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF DEFAULT as to Phoung Anh Huynh (c/m 6/12/2019 tds, Deputy Clerk)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Phoung Anh Huynh and Viet Pearl, LLC (c/m 6/12/2019 tds, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default for want of answer or other defense by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Hollimon, Justin)
April 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Notice to Strike Appearance Finamore (Finamore, Paul)
April 16, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Phoung Anh Huynh served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019.(Hollimon, Justin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Viet Pearl, LLC served on 4/16/2019, answer due 5/7/2019.(Hollimon, Justin)
April 16, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. Phoung Anh Huynh served on 4/12/2019, answer due 5/3/2019.(Hollimon, Justin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to Phoung Anh Huynh and Viet Pearl, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Proposed Summons Huynh (Hollimon, Justin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. Proposed Summons for Viet Pearl LLC (Hollimon, Justin)
April 10, 2019 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Proposed Summons. To correct this problem, file Proposed Summons using the event Notice (Other) and link Proposed Summons to #1 . (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
April 10, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hollimon, Justin) Modified on 4/10/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).
April 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7943223.), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc..(Hollimon, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Huynh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Michael Hollimon
Represented By: Paul McDermott Finamore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viet Pearl, LLC
Represented By: Sean Robert Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phoung Anh Huynh
Represented By: Sean Robert Day
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?