Allstate Insurance Company v. Samuel et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Andre Antonio Samuel, Stanley Rochkind, N.B.S. Inc., Charles W. Runkles, Dear Management & Construction Company and S&S Partnership
Case Number: 1:2019cv01142
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 5:8705
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT Joint - Trial Date by Allstate Insurance Company(Smith, Adam)
June 23, 2019 Filing 22 Consent to Magistrate Judge (Sprehn, Amanda)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER re Referral of case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/21/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Directing Parties to Submit Magistrate Judge Consent Form(s) re #18 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/21/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/21/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/24/2019. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/20/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER. The Court has received the Joint Status Report (ECF 16). The telephone conference scheduled for June 25, 2019, has been cancelled. A Scheduling Order will issue. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/20/2019. (kw, Chambers)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT JOINT STATUS REPORT by Allstate Insurance Company(Sprehn, Amanda)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER re: Conference call. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Draft Scheduling Order)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Dear Management & Construction Company served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019.(Sprehn, Amanda)
June 4, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. N.B.S. Inc. served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019.(Sprehn, Amanda)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Charles W. Runkles served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019.(Sprehn, Amanda)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. S&S Partnership served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019.(Sprehn, Amanda)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Stanley Rochkind served on 4/29/2019, answer due 5/20/2019.(Sprehn, Amanda)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Andre Antonio Samuel served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(Sprehn, Amanda)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by S&S Partnership identifying Corporate Parent SS4 BUSINESS TRUST for S&S Partnership.(Spern, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by N.B.S. Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NB2 Business Trust for N.B.S. Inc..(Spern, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dear Management & Construction Company (Spern, Brian)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dear Management & Construction Company, N.B.S. Inc., Stanley Rochkind, Charles W. Runkles, S&S Partnership.(Spern, Brian)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Andre Antonio Samuel.(Brown, Brian)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Dear Management & Construction Company, N.B.S. Inc., Stanley Rochkind, Charles W. Runkles, S&S Partnership, Andre Antonio Samuel.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Judge Richard D. Bennett no longer assigned to the case. (kos, Deputy Clerk)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Other Affiliate Allstate Insurance Holdings LLC for ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Sprehn, Amanda)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7960437.), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A- Underlying Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B- Insurance Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Samuels, #5 Summons Rochkind, #6 Summons NBS, #7 Summons DEAR, #8 Summons S&S, #9 Summons Runkles)(Sprehn, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Samuel et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andre Antonio Samuel
Represented By: Brian S Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Rochkind
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.B.S. Inc.
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Runkles
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dear Management & Construction Company
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S&S Partnership
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Amanda C Sprehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?