Crump v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Adria Crump
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2019cv01150
Filed: April 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (RDB-19-785). (dass, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Consolidating Cases RDB-19-0785 and RDB-19-1150. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/27/2019. (dass, Deputy Clerk) (c/m 6/28/19-das)
June 28, 2019 Filing 36 Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Adria Crump ( c/m 6/28/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 27, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss by Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Proposed Dismissal Order, #3 Certificate of Service)(Rigney, Amy)
June 27, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy C Rigney on behalf of Social Security Administration (Rigney, Amy)
May 28, 2019 Filing 33 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Adria Crump.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 32 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by Adria Crump.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 31 Consent to Magistrate Judge as to Adria Crump. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE to Substitute Attorney (LeDuc, Vickie)
May 2, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Motions Ruling - Motion is denied as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Motion as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Request for Order of Default denied as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Request for Order of Default denied as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Request - Order of Default/Non-Military Affidavit as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Denied - Request for Order of Default as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Subpoena as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Subpoena as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Writ of Summons to SSA as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Affidavit of Service as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Amended Complaint as filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)(Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Writ of Summons as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Amended Complaint as filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3)(Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Writ of Summons to SSA as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Order Regardng Request for Waiver of Prepaid Costs as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by Social Security Administration re #12 Local Rule Complaint and attachment as filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 Attachment)(Loucks, Allen)
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of State Court Papers(Loucks, Allen)
April 25, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Adria Crump.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/23/2019. (c/m 4/24/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
April 23, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #8 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by Social Security Administration.(Loucks, Allen)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 4/19/2019. (c/m 4/19/19) (ds3, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/19/2019 (ds3, Deputy Clerk).
April 19, 2019 Filing 7 Correspondence from Court re: Removal Letter (c/m 4/19/19) (ds3, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/19/2019 (ds3, Deputy Clerk).
April 19, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by Adria Crump (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2019 Filing 5 Request for Default Judgment by Adria Crump (ds3, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/19/2019 (ds3, Deputy Clerk).
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Order of Default by Adria Crump (ds3, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 4/19/2019 (ds3, Deputy Clerk).
April 19, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
April 19, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time by Social Security Administration (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Loucks, Allen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 - Certification Re: State Court Papers(Loucks, Allen)
April 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, case number 03-C-18-011575., filed by Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Request for Order of Default as filed in State Court, #4 State Court Docket Sheet)(Loucks, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crump v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Represented By: Allen F Loucks
Represented By: Vickie LeDuc
Represented By: Amy C Rigney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adria Crump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?