Leading Technology Composites, Inc. v. MV2, LLC

Plaintiff: Leading Technology Composites, Inc.
Defendant: MV2, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01256
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/2/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by Leading Technology Composites, Inc. - Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material (Lewis, Jean)
June 27, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE in Opposition re #18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by MV2, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Jan 17, 2019 Letter)(Gaeng, Gerard)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PROTECTIVE/CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/24/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/24/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 25 Correspondence re: Reply Letter re Preliminary Protective Order (Gaeng, Gerard)
June 19, 2019 Filing 24 Correspondence re: [LTC proposed] Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - [LTC proposed] Stipulated Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material)(Lewis, Jean)
June 19, 2019 Filing 23 Correspondence re: Joint Proposed Scheduling Order (Lewis, Jean)
June 19, 2019 Filing 22 Correspondence re: Preliminary Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Attachment MV2 Proposed Protective Order)(Gaeng, Gerard)
June 18, 2019 Filing 21 ANSWER to #16 Counterclaim Counts I and II by Leading Technology Composites, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Lewis, Jean) Modified on 6/19/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
June 17, 2019 Telephone Conference held on 6/17/2019 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order MV2 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Gaeng, Gerard)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 Correspondence re: Submitting Plaintiff's Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Lewis, Jean)
June 13, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Leading Technology Composites, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Count III of MV2, LLC's Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Count III of MV2, LLC's Counterclaim, #3 Exhibit B to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Count III of MV2, LLC's Counterclaim, #4 Exhibit C to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Count III of MV2, LLC's Counterclaim, #5 Text of Proposed Order)(Lewis, Jean)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER scheduling conference call. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/5/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Leading Technology Composites, Inc. by MV2, LLC.(Gaeng, Gerard)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MV2, LLC (Gaeng, Gerard)
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Daniel Tanner. Directing attorney Daniel Tanner to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/16/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Daniel A. Tanner, III (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8007699.) by MV2, LLC(Gaeng, Gerard)
May 9, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by George Adam Ruther on behalf of MV2, LLC (Ruther, George)
May 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Gerard J Gaeng on behalf of MV2, LLC (Gaeng, Gerard)
May 7, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Mary Jane Peal. Directing attorney Mary Jane Peal to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/7/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jesse J Camacho. Directing attorney Jesse J Camacho to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/7/2019. (srds, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leading Technology Composites, Inc.. MV2, LLC served on 5/2/2019, answer due 5/23/2019.(Redd, Justin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Mary Jane Peal (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7983932.) by Leading Technology Composites, Inc.(Redd, Justin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jesse J. Camacho (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7983836.) by Leading Technology Composites, Inc.(Redd, Justin)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to MV2, LLC.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Leading Technology Composites, Inc. (Redd, Justin)
April 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Akihiko Redd on behalf of Leading Technology Composites, Inc. (Redd, Justin)
April 29, 2019 Filing 2 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark re #1 Complaint,, filed by Leading Technology Composites, Inc. (Lewis, Jean)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against MV2, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7981294.), filed by Leading Technology Composites, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Complaint, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Complaint, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Complaint, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Complaint, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Complaint, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Complaint, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I to Complaint, #11 Summons)(Lewis, Jean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leading Technology Composites, Inc. v. MV2, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leading Technology Composites, Inc.
Represented By: Jean Evelyn Lewis
Represented By: Justin Akihiko Redd
Represented By: Mary Jane Peal
Represented By: Jesse J Camacho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MV2, LLC
Represented By: George Adam Ruther
Represented By: Daniel Tanner
Represented By: Gerard J Gaeng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?