Morrison v. AT&T Mobility, LLC Featured Case
Plaintiff: Tyler Morrison
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01257
Filed: April 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration MOTION to Stay Litigation filed by Tyler Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AT&T Terms and Conditions)(Zajdel, Cory)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER re #6 Stipulation filed by AT&T Mobility, LLC. The Stipulation (ECF No. 6) is construed as a motion for extension of time and is GRANTED. The briefing schedule is as stated in the motion. The prior order as to ECF No. 7 was entered in error. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 8/9/2019. (vdcs, Chambers)
July 16, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tyler Morrison (Zajdel, Cory)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Compel; granting #7 Motion to Stay. The Stipulation (ECF No. 6) is construed as a motion for extension of time and is GRANTED. The briefing schedule is as stated in the motion. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 7/15/2019. (vdcs, Chambers)
July 12, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration, MOTION to Stay Litigation by AT&T Mobility, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Doug McCarthy, #3 Exhibit 1 of the McCarthy Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2 of the McCarthy Declaration, #5 Exhibit 3 of the McCarthy Declaration, #6 Exhibit 4 of the McCarthy Declaration, #7 Exhibit 5 of the McCarthy Declaration, #8 Declaration of Richard Rives, #9 Exhibit 1 of the Rives Declaration, #10 Declaration of Lara Schnieber, #11 Exhibit 1 of the Schnieber Declaration, #12 Exhibit 2 of the Schnieber Declaration, #13 Declaration of Daniel E. Jones, #14 Exhibit 1 of the Jones Declaration, #15 Exhibit 2 of the Jones Declaration)(Parasharami, Archis) Modified on 8/9/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Regarding Briefing Schedule for Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration and to Stay Litigation by AT&T Mobility, LLC(Parasharami, Archis)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Document. Defendant's response due 7/14/19. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 5/21/2019. (vdcs, Chambers)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by AT&T Mobility, LLC(Parasharami, Archis)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Archis A. Parasharami on behalf of AT&T Mobility, LLC (Parasharami, Archis)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to AT&T Mobility, LLC.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7981394.), filed by Tyler Morrison. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(Zajdel, Cory)
April 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AT&T Mobility, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7981394.), filed by Tyler Morrison. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I)(Zajdel, Cory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morrison v. AT&T Mobility, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Mobility, LLC
Represented By: Archis A. Parasharami
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Morrison
Represented By: David Matthew Trojanowski
Represented By: Jeffrey Christopher Toppe
Represented By: Cory L Zajdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?