Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.P. et al v. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Plaintiff: Energy Recovery Council, TMS Hauling, LLC, Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.P., Curtis Bay Energy, L.P. and National Waste & Recycling Association
Defendant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Case Number: 1:2019cv01264
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/16/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Dougherty, John)
May 16, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by John Fitzgerald Dougherty on behalf of Mayor and City Council of Baltimore (Dougherty, John)
May 10, 2019 Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Meghan Morgan. Directing attorney Meghan Morgan to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joshua H Van Eaton. Directing attorney Joshua H Van Eaton to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David M Friedland. Directing attorney David M Friedland to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James B Slaughter. Directing attorney James B Slaughter to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Meghan L. Morgan (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7994504.) by Energy Recovery Council, National Waste & Recycling Association, TMS Hauling, LLC, Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.P.(Prather, Roy)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joshua H. Van Eaton (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7994496.) by Energy Recovery Council, National Waste & Recycling Association, TMS Hauling, LLC, Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.P.(Prather, Roy)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David Friedland (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7994483.) by Energy Recovery Council, National Waste & Recycling Association, TMS Hauling, LLC, Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.P.(Prather, Roy)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for James B. Slaughter (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7994424.) by Energy Recovery Council, National Waste & Recycling Association, TMS Hauling, LLC, Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.P.(Prather, Roy)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.P., TMS Hauling, LLC, Curtis Bay Energy, L.P., Energy Recovery Council, National Waste & Recycling Association. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore served on 5/1/2019, answer due 5/22/2019.(Prather, Roy)
May 1, 2019 Filing 7 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by TMS Hauling, LLC (Prather, Roy)
May 1, 2019 Filing 6 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by National Waste & Recycling Association (Prather, Roy)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Energy Recovery Council (Prather, Roy)
May 1, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.P. (Prather, Roy)
May 1, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Curtis Bay Energy, L.P. (Zivkovich, Michael)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Mayor and City Council of Baltimore.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mayor and City Council of Baltimore ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7982265.), filed by Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.P., TMS Hauling LLC, Curtis Bay Energy, L.P., Energy Recovery Council, National Waste & Recycling Association. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Summons)(Prather, Roy)
April 30, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.P. et al v. Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Energy Recovery Council
Represented By: Roy D Prather, III
Represented By: Joshua H Van Eaton
Represented By: Meghan L Morgan
Represented By: James B Slaughter
Represented By: David M Friedland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TMS Hauling, LLC
Represented By: Roy D Prather, III
Represented By: Joshua H Van Eaton
Represented By: Meghan L Morgan
Represented By: James B Slaughter
Represented By: David M Friedland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wheelabrator Baltimore, L.P.
Represented By: Roy D Prather, III
Represented By: Joshua H Van Eaton
Represented By: Meghan L Morgan
Represented By: James B Slaughter
Represented By: David M Friedland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Bay Energy, L.P.
Represented By: Michael Trent Zivkovich
Represented By: George Faulkner Ritchie, IV
Represented By: Michael C Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: National Waste & Recycling Association
Represented By: Roy D Prather, III
Represented By: Joshua H Van Eaton
Represented By: Meghan L Morgan
Represented By: James B Slaughter
Represented By: David M Friedland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore
Represented By: John Fitzgerald Dougherty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?