Ray et al v. T-Mobile US, Inc. Featured Case

Plaintiffs alleged that Defendant T-Mobile US, Inc. sold the geolocation data collected from its customers' cell phones to third-party data aggregators in violation of the Federal Communications Act and its own Privacy Policy and Code of Business Conduct.

Plaintiff: Kantice Joyner and Shawnay Ray
Defendant: T-Mobile and T-Mobile US, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01299
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Referring Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jonathan Weiss. Directing attorney Jonathan Weiss to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/4/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Bradley Ruskin. Directing attorney Bradley Ruskin to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/4/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer. T-Mobile US, Inc. answer due 7/8/2019. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/3/2019. (vdcs, Chambers)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by T-Mobile US, Inc.(Romero, Marlynda)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan M. Weiss (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8045617.) by T-Mobile US, Inc.(Romero, Marlynda)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Bradley I. Ruskin (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8045565.) by T-Mobile US, Inc.(Romero, Marlynda)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Marlynda Romero on behalf of T-Mobile US, Inc. (Romero, Marlynda)
May 3, 2019 Case reassigned to Chief Judge James K. Bredar. Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 (WITHDRAWN)Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 5/3/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/3/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 (FILED IN ERROR)NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Kantice Joyner, Shawnay Ray or counsel for Kantice Joyner, Shawnay Ray are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/17/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/3/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to T-Mobile US, Inc.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T-Mobile US, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7988309.), filed by Kantice Joyner, Shawnay Ray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I)(Zajdel, Cory) Modified on 5/3/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T-Mobile US, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7988309.), filed by Kantice Joyner, Shawnay Ray. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I)(Zajdel, Cory) Modified on 5/3/2019 (kw2s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ray et al v. T-Mobile US, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T-Mobile US, Inc.
Represented By: Marlynda Romero
Represented By: Jonathan M Weiss
Represented By: Bradley Ruskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kantice Joyner
Represented By: David Matthew Trojanowski
Represented By: Jeffrey Christopher Toppe
Represented By: Cory L Zajdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawnay Ray
Represented By: David Matthew Trojanowski
Represented By: Jeffrey Christopher Toppe
Represented By: Cory L Zajdel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?