Nationwide Fire Insurance Company v. DeVere Insulation Company

Plaintiff: Nationwide Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: DeVere Insulation Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01304
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Dismissing this case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/29/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Nationwide Fire Insurance Company re #6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal proposed Order (Stravitz, Eric)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Nationwide Fire Insurance Company (Stravitz, Eric)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Rachel A Ward. Directing attorney Rachel A Ward to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/10/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Rachel A. Ward (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-7995733.) by Nationwide Fire Insurance Company(Stravitz, Eric)
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to DeVere Insulation Company.(slss, Deputy Clerk)
May 3, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 2, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Nationwide Fire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Property & Casualty Insurance Company, Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company for Nationwide Fire Insurance Company.(Stravitz, Eric)
May 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DeVere Insulation Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7989381.), filed by Nationwide Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Stravitz, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nationwide Fire Insurance Company v. DeVere Insulation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nationwide Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: Eric N Stravitz
Represented By: Rachel A Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DeVere Insulation Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?