Koontz v. Kimberley

Plaintiff: David Koontz
Defendant: Daniel Monn, Clayton Stottlemyer, John Doe #1, State of Maryland, Julia Kimberley, Meritus Medical Center, Inc., Howard Ward, Ben Jones, Bryan Glines, John Doe #2, Board of Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland, Spencer Shank and Greg Alton
Case Number: 1:2019cv01321
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION to Dismiss by State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Zacarias, Carl)
July 3, 2019 Filing 53 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by State of Maryland (Zacarias, Carl)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 MARGINAL ORDER approving #45 Consent Motion to Extend Time to File Initial Responsive Pleading. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/1/19.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MARGINAL ORDER approving #50 Motion to Permit Filing of Audio/Video Recordings as Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 50 MOTION Motion to Admit Audio/Video Recordings as Exhibits re #49 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative MOTION for Summary Judgment by Greg Alton, Bryan Glines, Ben Jones, Julia Kimberley, Daniel Monn, Spencer Shank, Clayton Stottlemyer, Howard Ward(Karpinski, Kevin)
June 28, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Greg Alton, Bryan Glines, Ben Jones, Julia Kimberley, Daniel Monn, Spencer Shank, Clayton Stottlemyer, Howard Ward (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support thereof, #2 Exhibit b, #3 Exhibit c, #4 Exhibit f)(Karpinski, Kevin) (Exhibits A, D, and E received and filed separately in electronic format 7/1/19 bh)
June 28, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Bifurcate by Board of Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support thereof)(Karpinski, Kevin)
June 24, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. State of Maryland or counsel for State of Maryland are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 7/8/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 45 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Pleading by State of Maryland(Zacarias, Carl)
June 13, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon Eric Rhoades on behalf of Meritus Medical Center, Inc. (Rhoades, Jon)
June 11, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Meritus Medical Center, Inc. or counsel for Meritus Medical Center, Inc. are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/25/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 42 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Meritus Medical Center, Inc. (Rodriguez, German)
June 10, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Meritus Medical Center, Inc..(Rodriguez, German)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 6/10/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #37 Consent to Magistrate Judge. Please correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. **Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 37 (FILED IN ERROR) Consent to Magistrate Judge (Rynd, Michael) Modified on 6/10/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
June 7, 2019 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Koontz. State of Maryland served on 5/30/2019, answer due 6/20/2019.(Teahan, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Koontz. Board of Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019.(Teahan, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 34 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Koontz. Meritus Medical Center, Inc. served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019.(Teahan, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 33 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Koontz. Ben Jones served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019.(Teahan, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 32 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Koontz. Spencer Shank served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019.(Teahan, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 31 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Koontz. Bryan Glines served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019.(Teahan, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 30 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Koontz. Daniel Monn served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019.(Teahan, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Koontz. Howard Ward served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019.(Teahan, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Koontz. Greg Alton served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019.(Teahan, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Koontz. Julia Kimberley served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019.(Teahan, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Koontz. Clayton Stottlemyer served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019.(Teahan, Margaret)
June 7, 2019 Filing 25 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Greg Alton, Board of Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland, Bryan Glines, Ben Jones, Julia Kimberley, Daniel Monn, Spencer Shank, Clayton Stottlemyer, Howard Ward (Karpinski, Kevin)
June 7, 2019 Filing 24 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint until and including Friday, June 28,2019 by Greg Alton, Board of Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland, Bryan Glines, Ben Jones, Julia Kimberley, Daniel Monn, Spencer Shank, Clayton Stottlemyer, Howard Ward (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of proposed order)(Karpinski, Kevin)
June 7, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Brooks Rynd on behalf of Greg Alton, Board of Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland, Bryan Glines, Ben Jones, Julia Kimberley, Daniel Monn, Spencer Shank, Clayton Stottlemyer, Howard Ward (Rynd, Michael)
June 7, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin Bock Karpinski on behalf of Greg Alton, Board of Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland, Bryan Glines, Ben Jones, Julia Kimberley, Daniel Monn, Spencer Shank, Clayton Stottlemyer, Howard Ward (Karpinski, Kevin)
May 17, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: 19 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. Please correct the following error(s):**Incorrect form used - complete the form Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here and refile using the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 18 Summons Issued 21 days as to Greg Alton, Board of Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland, Bryan Glines, Ben Jones, Julia Kimberley, Meritus Medical Center, Inc., Daniel Monn, Spencer Shank, State of Maryland, Clayton Stottlemyer, Howard Ward.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Spencer Shank (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Robert Slocum (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Nancy Kopp (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Meritus Medical Center (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Julia Kimberley (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Joseph Ross - John Doe 2 (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Joseph Ross - John Doe 1 (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Howard Ward (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Greg Alton (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Daniel Monn (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Clayton Stottlemyer (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Bryan Glines (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by David Koontz Summons - Ben Jones (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 (Teahan, Margaret)
May 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 5/6/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. David Koontz or counsel for David Koontz are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/20/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by David Koontz was filed incorrectly. **The following attachments or exhibits are missing - Summons. To correct this problem, file the Summons using the event Under Notices -> Notice (Other) and link Summons to #1 Complaint. **The Corporate Disclosure should not be filed as an attachment to the Complaint. Please refile using the event under Other Documents > Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement. The Corporate Disclosure has been marked as Filed in Error and the link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Koontz ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7993430.), filed by David Koontz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Affidavit)(Teahan, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Koontz v. Kimberley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Monn
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Michael Brooks Rynd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Stottlemyer
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Michael Brooks Rynd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland
Represented By: Carl N Zacarias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julia Kimberley
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Michael Brooks Rynd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meritus Medical Center, Inc.
Represented By: Jon Eric Rhoades
Represented By: German Ariel Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Ward
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Michael Brooks Rynd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Jones
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Michael Brooks Rynd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Glines
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Michael Brooks Rynd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Commissioners of Washington County, Maryland
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Michael Brooks Rynd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Shank
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Michael Brooks Rynd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Alton
Represented By: Kevin Bock Karpinski
Represented By: Michael Brooks Rynd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Koontz
Represented By: Margaret Alice Teahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?