Jones v. State of Maryland et al.

Plaintiff: Raymond Jones
Defendant: Allen Gang, J. Michael Stouffer, State of Maryland, Correctional Officer Householder, Stephen T. Moyer, Denise A. Gelsinger, Correctional Officer Fisher and Other Unidentified Officers
Case Number: 1:2019cv01335
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment by Denise A. Gelsinger, State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for Summary Judgment, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Attachment Attachment to Exhibit B)(Wilson, Michelle)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #8 consent motion for extension of time. The response to Plaintiff's complaint by Defendants State of Maryland and Denise Gelsinger is now due by June 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/24/2019. (Chasanow, Deborah)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Denise A. Gelsinger, State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilson, Michelle)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #6 consent motion for extension of time. The response to Plaintiff's complaint by Defendants State of Maryland and Denise Gelsinger is now due by May 28, 2019. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/13/2019. (Chasanow, Deborah)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time by Denise A. Gelsinger, State of Maryland (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order)(Wilson, Michelle)
May 8, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 14637114862 (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Denise A. Gelsinger, State of Maryland (Wilson, Michelle)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 Correspondence re: Defendants' Statement pursuant to Standing Order Concerning Removal (Wilson, Michelle)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 5/7/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT FROM STATE COURT against Correctional Officer Fisher, Correctional Officer Householder, Allen Gang, Denise A. Gelsinger, Stephen T. Moyer, Other Unidentified Officers, State of Maryland, and J. Michael Stouffer, filed by Raymond Jones. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report) (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 The case of Jones v. State of Maryland et al., has been opened in the District of Maryland. The case number is 1:19-cv-01335-DKC. PLEASE NOTE: You must pay the case filing fee within 48 hours. To pay online, select the event Civil Case Filing Fee which is found under Civil Events --> Other Filings --> Other Documents. Otherwise, forward a check made payable to Clerk, U.S. District Court and note the assigned case number on the check or cover letter. (km4s, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-19-001459., filed by State Of Maryland Department Of Public Safety And Correctional Services Division Of Corrections. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Summons, #4 Exhibit Circuit Court Notice of removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Michelle) Modified on 5/7/2019 (km4s, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. State of Maryland et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Gang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Michael Stouffer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland
Represented By: Michelle Keisha Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Householder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen T. Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denise A. Gelsinger
Represented By: Michelle Keisha Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unidentified Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Jones
Represented By: Ginina A Jackson Stevenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?