United States of America v. Colbert

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Pamela Colbert
Case Number: 1:2019cv01337
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER directing plaintiff to file and serve on the defendant a motion for entry of default by the Clerk and a motion for default judgment, or provide a report as to why such motions would be inappropriate, within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/25/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Pamela Colbert served on 5/20/2019, answer due 6/10/2019.(Cusson, Evelyn)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Pamela Colbert.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 5/9/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. United States of America or counsel for United States of America are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/23/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Pamela Colbert, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Text of Proposed Order, #10 Summons)(Cusson, Evelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Evelyn Lombardo Cusson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?