Gary v. The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty et al
Petitioner: Kevin Wayne Gary
Respondent: The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty, Jane Doe 1-10, David E. Ortiz, The Federal Bureau of Prisons, John Doe 1-10 and The District Attorney for Baltimore City
Case Number: 1:2019cv01348
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew DiMiceli on behalf of The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty (DiMiceli, Andrew)
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel John Jawor on behalf of The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty (Jawor, Daniel)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER Directing respondents to file answer within 40 days. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/29/2019. (c/m 5/30/19 bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Kevin Wayne Gary. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(bas, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gary v. The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kevin Wayne Gary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The People of the State of Maryland and Baltimore Cty
Represented By: Andrew DiMiceli
Represented By: Daniel John Jawor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jane Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David E. Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The Federal Bureau of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The District Attorney for Baltimore City
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?