Morris v. Levene et al
Plaintiff: Ashley Morris
Defendant: Martin R. Resnick, ALL OTHER PERSONS THAT HAVE OR CLAIM TO HAVE ANY INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY described as Property Identification Number 08-592890 located in Liberty Election District and further described as PARCEL ONE, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT (if any) leasing the property described as Property Identification Number 08-592890 located in Liberty Election District and further described as PARCEL ONE: PARCEL A CONTAINING 3.51, Maryland State Comptroller, Abraham L. Adler, Andrew Scott Lerner, Frederick County, Maryland, American Express Centurion Bank, U.S.A., ALL OTHER PERSONS THAT HAVE OR CLAIM TO HAVE ANY INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY described as Property Identification Number 08-592889 located in Liberty Election District and further described as PARCEL TWO, Marjorie E. Levene, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT (if any) leasing the property described as Property Identification Number 08-592889 located in Liberty Election District and further described as PARCEL TWO: RESERVE OR OUTLOT,, Douglas R. Levene and Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01351
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2019 Filing 71 RESPONSE re #69 MOTION for Other Relief Deferring Entry of an Order of Dismissal , RESPONSE in Opposition filed by U.S.A..(Loucks, Allen)
June 7, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Asnwer Deadline reset as to all Defendants. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 70 QC NOTICE: #68 Summons Returned Executed filed by Ashley Morris was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event was selected. Please refile using the event under Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed as to USA as to federal defendants only and the event under Service of Process > Summons Returned Executed as to all non-federal defendants. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 69 MOTION for Other Relief Deferring Entry of an Order of Dismissal by Ashley Morris (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Deferring Entry of an Order of Dismissal)(Heffner, Lawrence)
June 5, 2019 Filing 68 (FILED IN ERROR) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Morris. Abraham L. Adler served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; American Express Centurion Bank served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Frederick County, Maryland served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Andrew Scott Lerner served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Douglas R. Levene served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Marjorie E. Levene served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Maryland State Comptroller served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Martin R. Resnick served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; U.S.A. served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019., SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ashley Morris. Abraham L. Adler served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; American Express Centurion Bank served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Frederick County, Maryland served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Andrew Scott Lerner served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Douglas R. Levene served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Marjorie E. Levene served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Maryland State Comptroller served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; Martin R. Resnick served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019; U.S.A. served on 4/18/2019, answer due 5/9/2019.(Heffner, Lawrence) Modified on 6/7/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
June 4, 2019 Filing 67 REPLY to Response to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by U.S.A..(Loucks, Allen)
May 22, 2019 Filing 66 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ashley Morris. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Ashley Morris, Plaintiff's Answer to United States Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Copies of Federal Tax Liens)(Heffner, Lawrence)
May 22, 2019 Filing 65 RESPONSE to Motion re #3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Ashley Morris. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Ashley Morris, Plaintiff's Answer to United States Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A - Tax Liens)(Heffner, Lawrence)
May 14, 2019 Filing 64 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to Frederick County Maryland as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 63 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to Douglas R. Levene as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 62 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to Bryon C. Black as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to Matthew Whitaker as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 60 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to Lawrence E. Heffner, Jr. as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 59 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to U.S.A. as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 58 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to Andrew Scott Lerner as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 57 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to Martin R. Resnick as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 56 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to American Express Centurion Bank as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 55 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to Ramsay Michael Whitworth as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 54 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to Maryland State Comptroller as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 52 (FILED IN ERROR - Counsel will refile) NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to Douglas R. Levene (Loucks, Allen) Modified on 5/14/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
May 14, 2019 Filing 51 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Contemplated Dismissal to Ashley Morris as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 50 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Acknowledgment of Receipt of Complaint as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Ramsay Michael Whitworth as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 48 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Matthew G. Whitaker as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 47 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Martin R. Resnick as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 46 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Maryland State Comptroller as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 45 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Marjorie E. Levene as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 43 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Douglas R. Levene as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 42 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Andrew Scott Lerner as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 41 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Frederick County Maryland as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to American Express Centurion Bank as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 39 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Abraham L. Adler as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 38 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Line Requesting Reissue of Writ of Summons for Defendants as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 37 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Affidavit of Publication as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 36 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Abraham L. Adler as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 35 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to American Express Centurion Bank as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 34 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Frederick County Maryland as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 33 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Andrew Scott Lerner as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Douglas R. Levene as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Marjorie E. Levene as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 29 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Maryland State Comptroller as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Martin R. Resnick as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Matthew G. Whitaker as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to U.S.A c/o Robert K. Hur as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Writ of Summons to Ramsay Michael Whitworth as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Action to Foreclosure (Rule 14-502(B)(3)) as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Order of Publication as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Action to Foreclose (Rule 14-502(B)(3)) as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Motion Requesting Publication and For Posting by Private Process Server as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Affidavit for Attorney's Fees and Expenses for the Property as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Affidavit for Attorney's Fees and Expenses for the Property as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Affidavit of Compliance with Tax-Property Section 14-833(A-1) and MD Rule 14-502 as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Affidavit of Search as filed in State Court (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5, #6 Attachment 6, #7 Attachment 7, #8 Attachment 8)(Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule MDEC Deficiency Notice as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Notice of Action to Foreclose (Rule 14-502(B)(3)) as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Order of Publication as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Motion Requesting Publication and for Posting by Private Process Server as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Affidavit for Attorney's Fees and Expenses for the Property as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Affidavit for Attorney's Fees and Expenses for the Property as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by U.S.A. re #9 Local Rule Affidavit of Compliance with Tax-Property Section 14-833(A-1) and MD Rule 14-502 as filed in State Court (Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of Remaining State Court Papers(Loucks, Allen)
May 14, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #7 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by U.S.A..(Loucks, Allen)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/9/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-6) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR FREDERICK COUNTY. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Notice of Removal by U.S.A. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S.A.(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against ALL OTHER PERSONS THAT HAVE OR CLAIM TO HAVE ANY INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY described as Property Identification Number 08-592889 located in Liberty Election District and further described as PARCEL TWO, ALL OTHER PERSONS THAT HAVE OR CLAIM TO HAVE ANY INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY described as Property Identification Number 08-592890 located in Liberty Election District and further described as PARCEL ONE, Abraham L. Adler, American Express Centurion Bank, Frederick County, Maryland, Andrew Scott Lerner, Douglas R. Levene, Marjorie E. Levene, Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company, Maryland State Comptroller, Martin R. Resnick, U.S.A., UNKNOWN OCCUPANT (if any) leasing the property described as Property Identification Number 08-592889 located in Liberty Election District and further described as PARCEL TWO: RESERVE OR OUTLOT,, UNKNOWN OCCUPANT (if any) leasing the property described as Property Identification Number 08-592890 located in Liberty Election District and further described as PARCEL ONE: PARCEL A CONTAINING 3.51 filed by Ashley Morris. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by United States of America (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Loucks, Allen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 - Filing of State Court Papers(Loucks, Allen)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Frederick County, case number C-10-CV-18-001029., filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Summons as filed in State Court, #4 Complaint as filed in State Court, #5 Exhibit A to Complaint as filed in State Court, #6 Exhibit B to Complaint as filed in State Court)(Loucks, Allen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. Levene et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin R. Resnick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OTHER PERSONS THAT HAVE OR CLAIM TO HAVE ANY INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY described as Property Identification Number 08-592890 located in Liberty Election District and further described as PARCEL ONE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN OCCUPANT (if any) leasing the property described as Property Identification Number 08-592890 located in Liberty Election District and further described as PARCEL ONE: PARCEL A CONTAINING 3.51
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maryland State Comptroller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abraham L. Adler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Scott Lerner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frederick County, Maryland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Express Centurion Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S.A.
Represented By: Allen F Loucks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL OTHER PERSONS THAT HAVE OR CLAIM TO HAVE ANY INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY described as Property Identification Number 08-592889 located in Liberty Election District and further described as PARCEL TWO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marjorie E. Levene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNKNOWN OCCUPANT (if any) leasing the property described as Property Identification Number 08-592889 located in Liberty Election District and further described as PARCEL TWO: RESERVE OR OUTLOT,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas R. Levene
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manufacturers and Traders Trust Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Morris
Represented By: Lawrence E Heffner, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?