Moyd v. State of Maryland et al

Plaintiff: Antwan Moyd
Defendant: J. Michael Stouffer, State of Maryland, Officer Bowders, C. Shindledecker, Stephen T. Moyer, J. Stotler, Other Unidentified Officers and Casey Campbell
Case Number: 1:2019cv01356
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Antwan Moyd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandu of Law, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Francis-Williams, Latoya)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment until 6/14/2019. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/4/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Dismiss MOTION for Summary Judgment by Antwan Moyd. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Francis-Williams, Latoya)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Latoya Andrea Francis-Williams on behalf of Antwan Moyd (Francis-Williams, Latoya)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss , MOTION for Summary Judgment by Bowders, Casey Campbell, Stephen T. Moyer, C. Shindledecker, State of Maryland, J. Stotler, J. Michael Stouffer (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 Notice of Inmate Rule Violation and Declaration of Britt Brengle dated May 13, 2019)(Curnutte, Francis)
May 8, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal by Bowders, Casey Campbell, Stephen T. Moyer, C. Shindledecker, State of Maryland, J. Stotler, J. Michael Stouffer. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ginina A Jackson Stevenson, Brian E Frosh on behalf of Casey Campbell, State of Maryland. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Bowders, Casey Campbell, Stephen T. Moyer, Other Unidentified Officers, C. Shindledecker, State of Maryland, J. Stotler, J. Michael Stouffer by Antwan Moyd.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from the Circuit Court for Baltimore City by C. Shindledecker, Stephen T. Moyer, J. Stotler, State of Maryland, Bowders, J. Michael Stouffer, Casey Campbell. (Case number 24-C-19-000971, Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 14637114877) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Docket Sheet, #3 Cover Letter)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moyd v. State of Maryland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antwan Moyd
Represented By: Ginina A Jackson Stevenson
Represented By: Latoya Andrea Francis-Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Michael Stouffer
Represented By: Francis M. Curnutte, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Maryland
Represented By: Francis M. Curnutte, III
Represented By: Ginina A Jackson Stevenson
Represented By: Brian E Frosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Bowders
Represented By: Francis M. Curnutte, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Shindledecker
Represented By: Francis M. Curnutte, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen T. Moyer
Represented By: Francis M. Curnutte, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Stotler
Represented By: Francis M. Curnutte, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Other Unidentified Officers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Campbell
Represented By: Francis M. Curnutte, III
Represented By: Ginina A Jackson Stevenson
Represented By: Brian E Frosh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?