Safakv. United States Liability Insurance Co.

Plaintiff: SAMETTIN SAFAK
Defendant: United States Liability Insurance Company and United States Liability Insurance Co.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01362
Filed: May 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/14/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/11/2019. (Attachments: #1 Standing Memorandum to Counsel Concerning Discovery)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for Settlement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/11/2019. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Telephone Status Conference held on 6/10/2019 before Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by United States Liability Insurance Co..(Giroux, Danielle)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM to Counsel re: Telephone Conference on Draft Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/14/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/9/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 9, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4 and 5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR ANNE ARUNDEL COUNTY. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to United States Liability Insurance Co..(ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against United States Liability Insurance Co., filed by Samettin Safak. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Case Information Report)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 8, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by United States Liability Insurance Company.(Giroux, Danielle)
May 8, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by United States Liability Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway, Inc., Other Affiliate U.S. Investment Corp. for United States Liability Insurance Company.(Giroux, Danielle)
May 8, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Anne Arundel Circuit Court, case number C-02-CV19-000863. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8001588), filed by United States Liability Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giroux, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Safakv. United States Liability Insurance Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMETTIN SAFAK
Represented By: Andrew B Greenspan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Liability Insurance Company
Represented By: Danielle Deanna Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Liability Insurance Co.
Represented By: Danielle Deanna Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?