Allstate Insurance Company v. Powe et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: N-6, Inc., N.B.S., Inc., Stanley Rochkind, Rhoda Rochkind, Charles W. Runkles, Dear Management & Construction Company, Jack Novograd and Asia Powe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01376
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative MOTION to Stay filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Adam)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by N-6, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NB11 Business Trust for N-6, Inc..(Spern, Brian)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by N.B.S., Inc. identifying Corporate Parent NB11 Business Trust for N.B.S., Inc..(Spern, Brian)
July 2, 2019 Filing 13 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Dear Management & Construction Company (Spern, Brian)
July 2, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Dear Management & Construction Company, N-6, Inc., N.B.S., Inc., Jack Novograd, Rhoda Rochkind, Stanley Rochkind, Charles W. Runkles.(Spern, Brian)
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, MOTION to Stay by Asia Powe (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Stay, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clarke, Patrice)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #9 Motion to Dismiss filed by Asia Powe was filed incorrectly. **When filing a two part motion, dismiss and stay, please select both events. The motion has been terminated, marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, to Stay by Asia Powe (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative to Stay, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Clarke, Patrice) Modified on 7/2/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Rhoda Rochkind served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019.(Smith, Adam)
June 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Jack Novograd served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019.(Smith, Adam)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Stanley Rochkind served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019.(Smith, Adam)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Dear Management & Construction Company served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019; N-6, Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019; N.B.S., Inc. served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019; Charles W. Runkles served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019.(Smith, Adam)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Asia Powe served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019.(Smith, Adam)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Dear Management & Construction Company, N-6, Inc., N.B.S., Inc., Jack Novograd, Asia Powe, Rhoda Rochkind, Stanley Rochkind, Charles W. Runkles. (Attachments: #1 Stanley, #2 Rhoda, #3 Runkles, #4 Novograd, #5 N-6, #6 NBS, #7 Dear)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY identifying Corporate Parent The Allstate Corporation, Other Affiliate Allstate Insurance Holdings, LLC for ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY.(Smith, Adam)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8004754.), filed by ALLSTATE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Novograd, #5 Summons Dear, #6 Summons N.B.S., #7 Summons N-6, #8 Summons Runkles, #9 Summons Powe, #10 Summons Stanley, #11 Summons Rhoda)(Smith, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Powe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N-6, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N.B.S., Inc.
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stanley Rochkind
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhoda Rochkind
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles W. Runkles
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dear Management & Construction Company
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Novograd
Represented By: Brian Marshall Spern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asia Powe
Represented By: Patrice Meredith Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Adam Gregory Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?