State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company v. Lennox et al
Plaintiff: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Ronald Lennox and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01382
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: A David Copperthite
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Ronald Lennox, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Laura)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading by Ronald Lennox, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/20/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to file responsive pleading by Ronald Lennox, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Laura)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Basem Jacobs on behalf of State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Jacobs, Laura)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MARGINAL ORDER approving #5 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/6/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Ronald Lennox(Jacobs, Laura)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura Basem Jacobs on behalf of Ronald Lennox (Jacobs, Laura)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent State Auto Financial Corporation for State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company.(Robbins, Seth)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Ronald Lennox, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Magistrate Judge A. David Copperthite no longer assigned to the case. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8005262.), filed by State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex A - Budget CGL Policy, #2 Exhibit Ex B - Budget Contract, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - State Farm Denial, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Assignment, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Summons Ronald Lennox, #7 Summons State Farm)(Robbins, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company v. Lennox et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Automobile Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Seth A Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Lennox
Represented By: Laura Basem Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Laura Basem Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?