Lovess v. Akal Security, Inc.
Plaintiff: Leon Lovess
Defendant: Akal Security, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01389
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: James K Bredar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 7/1/2019. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 11/22/2019.. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum to Counsel Regarding Discovery Procedures)(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner for settlement conference. Signed by Chief Judge James K. Bredar on 6/24/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Leon Lovess Joint Report Local Rule 103.9 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Scheduling Order)(Weisbrot, Jason)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard George Dennis, III on behalf of Akal Security, Inc. (Dennis, Bernard)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 Correspondence re: Proposed Scheduling Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(vdcs, Chambers)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Defenses to Plaintiff's by Akal Security, Inc..(Remy, John)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Akal Security, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent KIIT Co. for Akal Security, Inc..(Remy, John)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Akal Security, Inc.(kw2s, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Leon Lovess (Womack, Justin)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Akal Security, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8006437.), filed by Leon Lovess. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Womack, Justin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lovess v. Akal Security, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Lovess
Represented By: Justin Marlon Womack
Represented By: Jason I Weisbrot
Represented By: Jacob Y Statman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Akal Security, Inc.
Represented By: John Michael Remy
Represented By: Bernard George Dennis, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?