Lyakhovetski v. New Hampshire Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Yakov Lyakhovetski
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01392
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Telephone Conference re: Scheduling held on 5/31/2019 before Judge George Levi Russell, III. (kmts, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SETTLEMENT ORDER DISMISSING case with each party to bear its own costs unless otherwise agreed without prejudice to the right of a party to move for good cause to reopen this action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/31/2019. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 16 STATUS REPORT Joint Letter Status Report by New Hampshire Insurance Company(Mueller, Eric)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Report due by 10/3/2019. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/21/2019. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling Order, #2 Standing Order on Discovery Procedures)(bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2019 Filing 14 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by New Hampshire Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIUH LLC, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for New Hampshire Insurance Company.(Mueller, Eric)
May 17, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint by New Hampshire Insurance Company.(Mueller, Eric)
May 16, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by New Hampshire Insurance Company.(Mueller, Eric)
May 16, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.5 Certification(Mueller, Eric)
May 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by New Hampshire Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Attachment State Court Pleading - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (Mueller, Eric)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by New Hampshire Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Attachment State Court Pleading - Private Process Server Affidavit (Mueller, Eric)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #7 Local Rule filed by New Hampshire Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **State court documents should not be attached to your Local Rule 103.5 Certification. They should be filed as separate entries. Please file any Amended Complaints, Counterclaims, Crossclaims, and pending motions using an event that relates to your document. Other documents can be filed using the event under Notices - Notice(Other). You do not need to refile state court documents that have already filed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.5 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Mueller, Eric) Modified on 5/15/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/13/2019. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2 thru 5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 Correspondence from Plaintiff re: Request for Spoken Language Interpreter(ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against New Hampshire Insurance Company, filed by Yakov Lyakhovetski. (Attachments: #1 Red Line Copy of Amended Complaint)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New Hampshire Insurance Company.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against New Hampshire Insurance Company, filed by Yakov Lyakhovetski. (Attachments: #1 Case Information Report)(ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Baltimore City Circuit Court, case number 24C19000692. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8006734), filed by New Hampshire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Mueller, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyakhovetski v. New Hampshire Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yakov Lyakhovetski
Represented By: Robert K Stegman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Hampshire Insurance Company
Represented By: Angela Williams Russell
Represented By: Eric S Mueller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?