Modern Remodeling, Inc. v. Tripod Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Modern Remodeling, Inc.
Defendant: Strong Wall Construction, LLC, Patrick Ryan Boyle, High Mark Construction, LLC, Randy Moran, David Drab, Rachel Franks, MGB Investments, LLC, Robert Gately Keenan, Tripod Holdings, LLC, Matthew Olesky, Robert Michael Kimball, Earl Edwards and Robert Gately Keenan, III
Case Number: 1:2019cv01397
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Catherine C Blake
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Stipulated ORDER Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material and Inadvertent Disclosure of Privileged Material. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/3/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Reply to Defendants' Oppositions to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Respond to Counterclaims. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/3/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 2, 2019 Filing 44 STIPULATION Regarding Confidentiality of Discovery Material and Inadvertent Disclosure of Privileged Material by Modern Remodeling, Inc.(Kresslein, Charles)
July 2, 2019 Filing 43 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Oppositions to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Counterclaims by Modern Remodeling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kresslein, Charles)
June 25, 2019 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Matthew Olesky.(Nowicki, Tyler)
June 25, 2019 Filing 41 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Modern Remodeling, Inc. by Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, Randy Moran, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Matthew Olesky.(Nowicki, Tyler) Modified on 6/25/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 24, 2019 Filing 40 QC NOTICE: #37 Answer to Complaint filed by Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Rachel Franks, Earl Edwards, Matthew Olesky, #38 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Rachel Franks, Earl Edwards, Matthew Olesky, #39 Counterclaim filed by Rachel Franks was filed incorrectly. **This filing continues to be repeatedly filed incorrectly, using various events, even after previous assistance from the Clerk's Office. Please contact the Clerk's Office for assistance BEFORE attempting to refile this document again, as we were unable to reach counsel by telephone. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 39 [FILED IN ERROR] COUNTERCLAIM against Modern Remodeling, Inc., filed by Rachel Franks.(Nowicki, Tyler) Modified on 6/24/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 24, 2019 Filing 38 [FILED IN ERROR] REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Matthew Olesky. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction)(Nowicki, Tyler) Modified on 6/24/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 24, 2019 Filing 37 [FILED IN ERROR] ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Randy Moran, Matthew Olesky.(Nowicki, Tyler) Modified on 6/24/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 19, 2019 Filing 36 [FILED IN ERROR] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Matthew Olesky (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Nowicki, John) Modified on 6/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 19, 2019 Filing 35 [FILED IN ERROR] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Randy Moran (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Nowicki, John) Modified on 6/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 19, 2019 Filing 34 [FILED IN ERROR] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Robert Gately Keenan, III (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Nowicki, John) Modified on 6/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 19, 2019 Filing 33 [FILED IN ERROR] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Rachel Franks (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Nowicki, John) Modified on 6/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 19, 2019 Filing 32 [FILED IN ERROR] MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Earl Edwards (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(Nowicki, John) Modified on 6/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 19, 2019 Filing 31 [FILED IN ERROR] ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Matthew Olesky.(Nowicki, John) Modified on 6/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 19, 2019 Filing 30 [FILED IN ERROR] ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Randy Moran.(Nowicki, John) Modified on 6/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 19, 2019 Filing 29 [FILED IN ERROR] ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Robert Gately Keenan, III.(Nowicki, John) Modified on 6/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 19, 2019 Filing 28 [FILED IN ERROR] ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Modern Remodeling, Inc. by Rachel Franks.(Nowicki, John) Modified on 6/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 6/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 19, 2019 Filing 27 [FILED IN ERROR] ANSWER to Complaint by Earl Edwards.(Nowicki, John) Modified on 6/21/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher for Mediation. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 6/18/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 6/17/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 24 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by MGB Investments, LLC (Allen, Steven)
June 14, 2019 Filing 23 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Strong Wall Construction, LLC (Allen, Steven)
June 14, 2019 Filing 22 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Tripod Holdings, LLC (Allen, Steven)
June 14, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by High Mark Construction, LLC (Allen, Steven)
June 14, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Patrick Ryan Boyle, David Drab, High Mark Construction, LLC, Robert Michael Kimball, MGB Investments, LLC, Strong Wall Construction, LLC, Tripod Holdings, LLC.(Maneche, Mark)
June 14, 2019 Filing 19 Tripod Holdings, Strong Wall Construction, High Mark Construction, MGB Investments, Boyle, Kimball and Drab's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and Request for Injunctive Relief, COUNTERCLAIM against Modern Remodeling, Inc. by Tripod Holdings, LLC, Robert Michael Kimball, Strong Wall Construction, LLC, MGB Investments, LLC, David Drab, High Mark Construction, LLC, Patrick Ryan Boyle.(Allen, Steven)
June 11, 2019 Filing 18 Settlement Conference - requesting (Kresslein, Charles)
June 7, 2019 Telephone Conference held on 6/7/2019 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark D Maneche on behalf of Patrick Ryan Boyle, David Drab, High Mark Construction, LLC, Robert Michael Kimball, Strong Wall Construction, LLC, Tripod Holdings, LLC (Maneche, Mark)
June 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven A Allen on behalf of Patrick Ryan Boyle, David Drab, High Mark Construction, LLC, Robert Michael Kimball, Strong Wall Construction, LLC, Tripod Holdings, LLC (Allen, Steven)
June 5, 2019 Filing 15 Joint Request for Conference (Kresslein, Charles)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MARGINAL ORDER approving #13 Status Report filed by Modern Remodeling, Inc.. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/31/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT by Modern Remodeling, Inc.(Kresslein, Charles)
May 24, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Nowicki on behalf of Matthew Olesky (Nowicki, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Nowicki on behalf of Rachel Franks (Nowicki, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Nowicki on behalf of Randy Moran (Nowicki, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Nowicki on behalf of Robert Gately Keenan, III (Nowicki, John)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John W Nowicki on behalf of Earl Edwards (Nowicki, John)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to Patrick Ryan Boyle, David Drab, Earl Edwards, Rachel Franks, High Mark Construction, LLC, Robert Gately Keenan, III, Robert Michael Kimball, MGB Investments, LLC, Randy Moran, Matthew Olesky, Strong Wall Construction, LLC, Tripod Holdings, LLC.(krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Telephone Conference held on 5/15/2019 before Judge Catherine C. Blake. (kams, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER confirming the results of the telephone conference call held on 5/15/19; denying as moot #3 Emergency Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 5/15/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
May 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Modern Remodeling, Inc. re #1 Complaint (Summons) (English, Donald)
May 13, 2019 Filing 4 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Modern Remodeling, Inc. was filed incorrectly. Summons not filed. Please file summons using the Notice entry and attach the summons to that entry. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
May 11, 2019 Filing 3 Emergency MOTION to Expedite Hearing, Expedited Briefing Schedule, and Expedited Discovery by Modern Remodeling, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(English, Donald)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Modern Remodeling, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Text of Proposed Order)(English, Donald)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8007130.), filed by Modern Remodeling, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(English, Donald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Modern Remodeling, Inc. v. Tripod Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strong Wall Construction, LLC
Represented By: Mark D Maneche
Represented By: Steven A Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Ryan Boyle
Represented By: Mark D Maneche
Represented By: Steven A Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: High Mark Construction, LLC
Represented By: Mark D Maneche
Represented By: Steven A Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Moran
Represented By: Tyler J Nowicki
Represented By: John W Nowicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Drab
Represented By: Mark D Maneche
Represented By: Steven A Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rachel Franks
Represented By: Tyler J Nowicki
Represented By: John W Nowicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGB Investments, LLC
Represented By: Steven A Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gately Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tripod Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Mark D Maneche
Represented By: Steven A Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Olesky
Represented By: Tyler J Nowicki
Represented By: John W Nowicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Michael Kimball
Represented By: Mark D Maneche
Represented By: Steven A Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Earl Edwards
Represented By: Tyler J Nowicki
Represented By: John W Nowicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Gately Keenan, III
Represented By: Tyler J Nowicki
Represented By: John W Nowicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Modern Remodeling, Inc.
Represented By: Wendy Hartmann Moore
Represented By: Charles Joseph Kresslein
Represented By: Donald Eugene English, Jr
Represented By: Melissa Menkel McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?