Lerman Container Corp. v. Lids and Jars, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Lerman Container Corp. d/b/a eBottles.com and Lerman Container Corp.
Defendant: LIDS AND JARS, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01414
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Referring Judge: George Jarrod Hazel
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jonathan M. Purow (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8120060.) by Lerman Container Corp.(Wood, Thomas)
July 8, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lids and Jars, L.L.C. re #13 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (Pennington, Edward)
July 8, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Lids and Jars, L.L.C. re #12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement (Pennington, Edward)
July 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM against Lerman Container Corp. by Lids and Jars, L.L.C..(Pennington, Edward)
July 8, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lids and Jars, L.L.C. (Pennington, Edward)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 6/18/2019. (jw2s, Deputy Clerk)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lerman Container Corp.. Lids and Jars, L.L.C. served on 5/17/2019, answer due 6/7/2019.(Wood, Thomas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 QC NOTICE: #6 Affidavit of Service, filed by Lerman Container Corp. was filed incorrectly. **Re-file using the Civil Event - Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Lids and Jars, L.L.C. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Pennington, Edward)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward A Pennington on behalf of Lids and Jars, L.L.C. (Pennington, Edward)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint with Exhibits, Disclosure of Corporate Interest, Jury Demand, and Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark served on Andreas Rickert, Co-Owner of Lids and Jars, L.L.C. on May 17, 2019, filed by Lerman Container Corp..(Wood, Thomas) Modified on 6/11/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
May 20, 2019 Case Reassigned to Judge George Jarrod Hazel. Judge Deborah K. Chasanow no longer assigned to the case. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2019 Filing 5 Supplemental to #1 Complaint, filed by Lerman Container Corp. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Wood, Thomas)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Lerman Container Corp. (Wood, Thomas) Modified on 5/16/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk).
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Lids and Jars, L.L.C.(jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement was filed as an attachment to the Complaint, please re-file using the civil event - Other Filings - Correspondence - Magistrate Judge-Consent to. The Statement must be filed by 5/23/2019 (jf3s, Deputy Clerk)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Report on Filing Patent/Trademark (Wood, Thomas)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LIDS AND JARS, L.L.C. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8011547.), filed by Lerman Container Corp. d/b/a eBottles.com. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Jury Demand, #4 Disclosure of Corporate Interest)(Wood, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lerman Container Corp. v. Lids and Jars, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lerman Container Corp. d/b/a eBottles.com
Represented By: Thomas M Wood, IV
Represented By: Robert Carroll Baker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lerman Container Corp.
Represented By: Thomas M Wood, IV
Represented By: Robert Carroll Baker, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIDS AND JARS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Edward A Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?