Mutual Benefit Insurance Company v. Breeden et al

Plaintiff: Mutual Benefit Insurance Company
Defendant: Miriam Breeden and Kenneth Breeden
Case Number: 1:2019cv01422
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 5, 2019 Filing 11 Correspondence Correcting Earlier Submission: #1 Complaint, Exhibit A (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Corrected)(Nemiroff, Alexander)
May 31, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Jacob C Cohn. Attorney Jacob C Cohn will receive a separate email with the previously issued CM/ECF login and password. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mutual Benefit Insurance Company. (Nemiroff, Alexander)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #6 Summons Returned Executed filed by Mutual Benefit Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event was selected. Please refile using the event under Service of Process: Waiver of Service Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Jacob C. Cohn (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8033192.) by Mutual Benefit Insurance Company(Nemiroff, Alexander)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mutual Benefit Insurance Company. (Nemiroff, Alexander) Modified on 5/24/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #4 Affidavit of Service filed by Mutual Benefit Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event was selected. Please refile using the event under Service of Process: Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kenneth Breeden on 05/20/2019, filed by Mutual Benefit Insurance Company.(Nemiroff, Alexander) Modified on 5/23/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mutual Benefit Insurance Company. Miriam Breeden waiver sent on 5/15/2019, answer due 7/15/2019.(Nemiroff, Alexander)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to Kenneth Breeden, Miriam Breeden.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kenneth Breeden, Miriam Breeden ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8012561.), filed by Mutual Benefit Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons directed to Miriam Breeden, #4 Summons directed to Kenneth Breeden)(Nemiroff, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mutual Benefit Insurance Company v. Breeden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miriam Breeden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Breeden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mutual Benefit Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexander Nemiroff
Represented By: Jacob C Cohn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?