Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. .12 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Washington County, Maryland, State of Maryland, Department of Natural Resources

Plaintiff: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Defendant: .12 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Washington County, Maryland, State of Maryland, Department of Natural Resources
Amicus Curiae: Sierra Club, Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Waterkeepers Chesapeake and Potomac Riverkeeper Network
Case Number: 1:2019cv01444
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER denying #34 Motion of Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Potomac Riverkeeper Network, Sierra Club, and Waterkeepers Chesapeake for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae; denying as moot #4 Motion of Plaintiff for Expedited Hearing on its Motion for an Order of Condemnation and for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 7/12/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 8, 2019 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Support re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for an Order of Condemnation filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Pff's Reply in Support of Its Motion for an Order of Condemnation and for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 1A to Pff's Reply in Support of Its Motion for an Order of Condemnation and for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Pff's Reply in Support of Its Motion for an Order of Condemnation and for Preliminary Injunction)(Weiner, Arnold)
July 8, 2019 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Support re #4 MOTION to Expedite a Hearing on Its Motion for an Order of Condemnation and for Preliminary Injunction filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC.(Weiner, Arnold)
July 8, 2019 Filing 36 RESPONSE in Opposition re #34 MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF AS AMICUS CURIAE filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Plaintiff's Opposition to Amici's Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Plaintiff's Opposition to Amici's Motion for Leave to File Brief as Amicus Curiae)(Weiner, Arnold)
July 8, 2019 Filing 35 MOTION to Strike #29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC's Memorandum in Support of Its Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Plaintiff Columbia Gas Transmission LLC's Motion to Strike Defendant's Motion to Dismiss)(Weiner, Arnold)
June 24, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION for Leave to File BRIEF AS AMICUS CURIAE by Chesapeake Climate Action Network, Sierra Club, Potomac Riverkeeper Network, Waterkeepers Chesapeake (Attachments: #1 AMICUS CURIAE BRIEF, #2 Disclosure of Corporate Interests)(Miller, Susan)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 PAPERLESS ORDER postponing the June 25, 2019 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/24/2019. (jmm, Chambers)
June 17, 2019 Filing 32 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by.12 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Washington County, Maryland, State of Maryland, Department of Natural Resources.(Snyder, Adam)
June 17, 2019 Filing 31 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Expedite a Hearing on Its Motion for an Order of Condemnation and for Preliminary Injunction filed by.12 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Washington County, Maryland, State of Maryland, Department of Natural Resources.(Snyder, Adam)
June 17, 2019 Filing 30 RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for an Order of Condemnation filed by.12 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Washington County, Maryland, State of Maryland, Department of Natural Resources.(Snyder, Adam)
June 17, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by.12 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Washington County, Maryland, State of Maryland, Department of Natural Resources (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Adam)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 LETTER ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference for Tuesday, June 25, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 6/5/2019. (jmm, Chambers)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan for Settlement. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 6/3/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Telephone Conference re: Schedule held on 5/31/2019 before Judge George Levi Russell, III. (kmts, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 26 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of John R Haug. Directing attorney John R Haug to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #14 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of David M Fedder. Directing attorney David M Fedder to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #13 Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Michael Harriss. Directing attorney Michael Harriss to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DIRECTING the Court to refer case to a U.S. Magistrate Judge for mediation; ADOPTING and APPROVING the proposed schedule set out in #22 Joint Status Report; SETTING date for motions hearing. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/31/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT , Joint Status Report per 5.28.19 Order, by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC(Gogel, Barry)
May 29, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Arnold M Weiner on behalf of Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Weiner, Arnold)
May 29, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam Dean Snyder on behalf of.12 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Washington County, Maryland, State of Maryland, Department of Natural Resources (Snyder, Adam)
May 29, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L Wazenski on behalf of All Defendants (Wazenski, Jennifer)
May 29, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by John Burnside Howard, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Howard, John)
May 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER scheduling teleconference; Joint Status Report due 5/29/19 by 4:30 p.m. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/28/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Proof of Service of Rule 71.1 Notice of Condemnation, Complaint in Condemnation, Civil Cover Sheet and Exhibits A-C; Plaintiff's Motion for an Order of Condemnation and for Preliminary Injunction, Exhibit One and Memorandum in Support; Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Hearing on its Motion for an Order of Condemnation and for Preliminary Injunction; Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice of David M. Fedder, John R. Haug and Michael Harriss; Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure of Corporate Interest by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC(Gogel, Barry)
May 23, 2019 Filing 15 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John R. Haug by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Gogel, Barry)
May 23, 2019 Filing 14 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David M. Fedder by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Gogel, Barry)
May 23, 2019 Filing 13 CORRECTED MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Harriss by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. The fee has already been paid.(Gogel, Barry)
May 23, 2019 Filing 12 QC NOTICE: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 QC NOTICE: #5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC needs to be modified. See attachment for details and corrective actions needed regarding the signature(s) on the motion. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 9 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TransCanada PipeLines Limited, Corporate Parent Columbia Pipeline Group, Inc., Corporate Parent CPG OpCo LP, Corporate Parent TransCanada Corporation, Corporate Parent TransCanada PipeLine USA Ltd., Other Affiliate Columbia Energy Group, Other Affiliate CEVCO Production Holdings I, LLC, Other Affiliate CNS Microwave, LLC, Other Affiliate Columbia Energy Holdings Corporation, Other Affiliate Columbia Energy Ventures, LLC, Other Affiliate Columbia Gibraltar Gathering, LLC, Other Affiliate Columbia Gulf Transmission, LLC, Other Affiliate Columbia Hardy Corporation, Other Affiliate Columbia Hardy Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Columbia Midstream & Minerals Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Columbia Midstream Group, LLC, Other Affiliate Columbia Pennant, LLC, Other Affiliate Columbia Pipeline Group Services Company, Other Affiliate Columbia Remainder Corporation, Other Affiliate Crossroads Pipeline Company, Other Affiliate Hardy Storage Company, LLC, Other Affiliate Pennant Field Gathering, LLC, Other Affiliate Pennant Midstream, LLC, Other Affiliate Pennant NGL, LLC, Other Affiliate Pennant Processing, LLC, Other Affiliate Pennant Residue Gathering, LLC, Other Affiliate Pennant Trunkline Gathering, LLC, Other Affiliate CPP GP LLC, Other Affiliate Columbia Pipeline Partners LP, Other Affiliate CPG OpCo GP LLC, Other Affiliate Millenium Pipeline Company, LLC for Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC.(Gogel, Barry)
May 20, 2019 Deficiency Notice -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 5/28/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC was filed incorrectly. Notice by United States (similar to a summons; it notifies the owner or person with a possible interest in the land of the proceedings or Summons,if filed instead of the Notice by United States and Notice of Lis Pendens were not filed. Please file documents. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Michael Harriss (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8020320.) by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC(Gogel, Barry)
May 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for John R. Haug (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8020310.) by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC(Gogel, Barry)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David M. Fedder (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8020291.) by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC(Gogel, Barry)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Expedite a Hearing on Its Motion for an Order of Condemnation and for Preliminary Injunction by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC(Gogel, Barry)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 Memorandum re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for an Order of Condemnation filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC.(Gogel, Barry)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and for an Order of Condemnation by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One - Declaration of Jacob Haney)(Gogel, Barry)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT IN CONDEMNATION against.12 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Washington County, Maryland, State of Maryland, Department of Natural Resources ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8017825.), filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - FERC Certificate, #3 Exhibit B - Easement Description and Plat, #4 Exhibit C - Notice of Condemnation)(Gogel, Barry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC v. .12 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Washington County, Maryland, State of Maryland, Department of Natural Resources
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC
Represented By: Barry L Gogel
Represented By: Arnold M Weiner
Represented By: David M Fedder
Represented By: John R Haug
Represented By: Michael Harriss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: .12 Acres of Land, More or Less, in Washington County, Maryland, State of Maryland, Department of Natural Resources
Represented By: John Burnside Howard, Jr
Represented By: Jennifer L Wazenski
Represented By: Adam Dean Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Sierra Club
Represented By: Susan Stevens Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chesapeake Climate Action Network
Represented By: Susan Stevens Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Waterkeepers Chesapeake
Represented By: Susan Stevens Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Potomac Riverkeeper Network
Represented By: Susan Stevens Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?