Brown v. Bratton et al

Plaintiff: Justin Brown
Defendant: Charles Copper, Sherry Bratton, Bryan North, Caroline County, Maryland and James Eastland
Case Number: 1:2019cv01450
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Stephanie A Gallagher
Referring Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981jb
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #18 Motion for Leave to File in Excess of 35 pages. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 7/1/2019. (ba, Deputy Clerk)
June 26, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim & Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Sherry Bratton, Caroline County, Maryland, Charles Copper, James Eastland, Bryan North.(Levine, Jason)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim & Lack of Jurisdiction, #18 MOTION for Leave to File In excess of 35 pages filed by Justin Brown. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A, #3 Exhibit Exhibits B, #4 Exhibit Exhibits C, #5 Exhibit Exhibits D, #6 Exhibit Exhibits E)(Hansel, Cary)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File In excess of 35 pages by Justin Brown (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hansel, Cary)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/4/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk) (bas, Deputy Clerk).
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim & Lack of Jurisdiction by Justin Brown. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hansel, Cary)
May 29, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Brown. Sherry Bratton served on 5/19/2019, answer due 6/10/2019.(Hansel, Cary)
May 29, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Brown. James Eastland served on 5/19/2019, answer due 6/10/2019.(Hansel, Cary)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Brown. Charles Copper served on 5/18/2019, answer due 6/10/2019.(Hansel, Cary)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Brown. Caroline County, Maryland served on 5/19/2019, answer due 6/10/2019.(Hansel, Cary)
May 29, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Justin Brown. Bryan North served on 5/19/2019, answer due 6/10/2019.(Hansel, Cary)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim & Lack of Jurisdiction by Sherry Bratton, Caroline County, Maryland, Charles Copper, James Eastland, Bryan North (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Levine, Jason)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Sherry Bratton, Caroline County, Maryland, Charles Copper, James Eastland, Bryan North (Levine, Jason)
May 28, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Lee Levine on behalf of All Defendants (Levine, Jason)
May 17, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to Sherry Bratton, Caroline County, Maryland, Charles Copper, James Eastland, Bryan North.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephanie A Gallagher on 5/16/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher. Justin Brown or counsel for Justin Brown are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 5/30/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2019 Jury Trial Demand by Justin Brown(bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Justin Brown (Hansel, Cary)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8018324.), filed by Justin Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hansel, Cary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Bratton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Justin Brown
Represented By: Erienne Sutherell
Represented By: Cary Johnson Hansel, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Copper
Represented By: Jason Lee Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherry Bratton
Represented By: Jason Lee Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan North
Represented By: Jason Lee Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caroline County, Maryland
Represented By: Jason Lee Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Eastland
Represented By: Jason Lee Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?