Durodoye v. Ruby Tuesday Inc.

Plaintiff: TAJU OLAROTIMI DURODOYE
Defendant: RUBY TUESDAY INC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01494
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Beth P Gesner
Referring Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ruby Tuesday Inc..(Davis, Donald)
July 19, 2019 Filing 11 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Ruby Tuesday Inc. identifying Other Affiliate RTI Holding Company, LLC for Ruby Tuesday Inc..(Davis, Donald)
June 18, 2019 Case reassigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner no longer assigned to the case. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #8 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 6/18/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER directing Taju Olarotimi Durodoye to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 7/26/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Taju Olarotimi Durodoye files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 6/6/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued 21 days as to Ruby Tuesday Inc.(jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Taju Olarotimi Durodoye re #1 Complaint, Summons for Service (Suleman, Fatai)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint, filed by Taju Olarotimi Durodoye was filed incorrectly. Summons filed are not complete. Please file completed summons using the Notice entry from the menu and attach the summons. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner on 5/22/2019. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Beth P. Gesner. Taju Olarotimi Durodoye or counsel for Taju Olarotimi Durodoye are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/5/2019. (slss, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Taju Olarotimi Durodoye (Suleman, Fatai) Modified on 5/22/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk).
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Taju Olarotimi. Durodoye against Ruby Tuesday Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8023679.), filed by Taju Olarotimi Durodoye. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Plaintiff's Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Suleman, Fatai) Modified on 5/22/2019 (slss, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Durodoye v. Ruby Tuesday Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RUBY TUESDAY INC.
Represented By: Donald Carrington Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TAJU OLAROTIMI DURODOYE
Represented By: Fatai A Suleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?