Falling v. Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore et al

Plaintiff: Kohl Falling
Defendant: Kohl Fallin, Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore and Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City Andre Davis City Solicitor
Case Number: 1:2019cv01500
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Deborah K Chasanow
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City Andre Davis City Solicitor.(Snyder, Sharon)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #23 consent motion for extension of time. Defendant's reply to #4 motion to dismiss is now due by July 19, 2019. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 7/12/2019. (Chasanow, Deborah)
July 11, 2019 Filing 23 Consent REQUEST for Extension of Time to File Reply (Snyder, Sharon)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 RESPONSE re #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Kohl Falling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Dhali, Arinderjit)
June 3, 2019 Filing 21 Local Rule 103.5 Certificate.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 20 State Court Case History Docket Sheet. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Jeffrey M. Geller Baltimore City Circuit Court Judge on 5/10/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice by Kohl Falling(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss filed by Kohl Falling.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 16 STATE COURT FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City Andre Davis City Solicitor, filed by Kohl Falling. (Attachments: #1 Redline version of Amended Complaint)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing First Amended State Court Complaint by Kohl Falling. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 14 LINE Withdrawing and Substituting Appearance. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 13 STATE COURT NOTICE of Hearing: Regarding Motion to Dismiss. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Denying as moot #11 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Julie R. Rubin State Court Judge on 4/2/2019. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City Andre Davis City Solicitor (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Baltimore City Dept. of Transportation on 12/21/2018, filed by Kohl Falling.(heps, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 6/4/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk). (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/4/2019: #1 Affidavit) (heps, Deputy Clerk).
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address of Attorney and correcting spelling of the plaintiff's name by Stacie Reimer. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City Andre Davis City Solicitor, filed by Kohl Falling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 State Court Case Information Report)(heps, Deputy Clerk)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER GRANTING #6 joint motion for extension of time. Plaintiff's response to #4 motion to dismiss is due by June 24, 2019, and Defendant's reply is due by July 12, 2019. Signed by Judge Deborah K. Chasanow on 6/3/2019. (Chasanow, Deborah)
June 3, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City Andre Davis City Solicitor.(Snyder, Sharon)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City Andre Davis City Solicitor (Snyder, Sharon)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City Andre Davis City Solicitor (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Snyder, Sharon)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 QC NOTICE: #2 Local Rule filed by Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City Andre Davis City Solicitor was filed incorrectly. The wrong event was selected. ). Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to #1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. File any pending motions as separate docket entries. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (heps, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 (FILED IN ERROR) Local Rule 103.5 (Attachments: #1 Attachment Original Complaint, #2 Attachment Handwritten notice from P's Counsel changing address and spelling of P's name, #3 Attachment Transmittal letter and return of service on on Director of Baltimore City Department of Transportation, #4 Attachment BCDOT's Motion To Dismiss, Memo In Support and Proposed Order, #5 Attachment Court Order cancelling hearing on BCDOT motion to dismiss on grounds of mootness, #6 Attachment Notice of Withdrawal of P's Counsel Stacie Reimer, #7 Attachment Transmittal letter from P's Counsel, submitting an original and a blacklined First Amended Complaint, #8 Attachment P's First Amended Complaint (clean copy), #9 Attachment Blacklined copy of First Amended Complaint, #10 Attachment Fax cover sheet and attachment from Clerk's Office, notifying counsel that Order had been issued and cancelling hearing, #11 Attachment Line removing Benjamin Bor and substitution Sharon Snyder as counsel for the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, #12 Attachment Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice filed by Stacie Reimer on behalf of Arinderjit Dhali, #13 Attachment Order granting motion pro hac vice, #14 Attachment Transmittal letter and return of service on the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore, #15 Attachment Docket Sheet as of 5/20/2019 from the Circuit Court, #16 Attachment Plaintiff's Opposition To BCDOT's Motion To Dismiss, #17 Attachment Index to the Circuit Court documents)(Snyder, Sharon) Modified on 5/23/2019 (heps, Deputy Clerk).
May 21, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Deborah K. Chasanow. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-18-005805 OT. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8024397), filed by Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit P's First Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit Return of Service for 4/22/2019, #4 Exhibit Initial Compl. and State Information Report, #5 Exhibit DOT Motion To Dismiss initial Complaint)(Snyder, Sharon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Falling v. Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohl Fallin
Represented By: Stacie Reimer
Represented By: Arinderjit Dhali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor and City Council Of Baltimore
Represented By: Sharon A Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City Andre Davis City Solicitor
Represented By: Sharon A Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kohl Falling
Represented By: Stacie Reimer
Represented By: Arinderjit Dhali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?