Bekele et al v. Giant Food Stores, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kevin Greenville and Tsion Bekele
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc. and Giant Food Stores, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01503
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2019 Filing 18 Correspondence re: Plaintiffs' 5/30 and 6/4 letters (Kahn, Joshua)
June 5, 2019 Filing 17 Correspondence re: Statement Concerning Removal (Kahn, Joshua)
June 4, 2019 Filing 16 Correspondence re: Letter to Judge regarding Remand (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Letter)(Persky, Dori)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 Correspondence re: Letter to Judge with Exhibits (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 to Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 to Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 to Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 to Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 to Letter)(Persky, Dori)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 5/23/2019. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum of Law in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk)(originally filed in USBC for the District of Maryland on 5/20/2019)
May 20, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (8-12) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE UNITED STATES BANKRUPTCY COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF MARYLAND. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tsion Bekele, Kevin Greenville. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibits 2 - 32, #4 Exhibit 33)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 10 Correspondence to the Honorable Wendelin I. Lipp from Dori A. Persky, counsel for Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Correspondence to the Honorable Wendelin I. Lipp from Kristen S. Eustis, counsel for Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. (Attachments: #1 SDNY Order dated 4/30/2019 signed by Chief Judge McMahon)(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 8 Statement Pursuant to Rule 9027(e)(3) by Tsion Bekele, Kevin Greenville. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (2-7) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE CITY, MARYLAND. (kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Giant Food Stores, LLC, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, filed by Tsion Bekele, Kevin Greenville.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Giant Food Stores, LLC, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, filed by Tsion Bekele, Kevin Greenville.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #4 Second Amended Complaint by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 4 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Giant Food Stores, LLC, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, filed by Tsion Bekele, Kevin Greenville.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Giant Food Stores, LLC, Imerys Talc America, Inc., Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, filed by Tsion Bekele, Kevin Greenville.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Giant Food Stores, LLC, filed by Tsion Bekele, Kevin Greenville.(kns, Deputy Clerk)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore City, Maryland, case number 24x18000357, filed by Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. transmitted from the United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Maryland. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1 - Complaint, #2 Attachment 2 - Summons - Giant Food Stores, LLC, #3 Attachment 3 - Amended Complaint by Interlineation, #4 Attachment 4 - Summons - Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, #5 Attachment 5 - Summons - Imerys Talc America, Inc., #6 Attachment 6 - Summons - Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc., #7 Attachment 7 - Summons - Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc, #8 Attachment 8 - Notice of Suggestion of Pendency of Bankruptcy and Automatic Stay of Proceedings re Imerys Talc America, Inc. and Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc., #9 Attachment 9 - Second Amended Complaint by Interlineation, #10 Attachment 10 - Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc's Answer, #11 Attachment 11 - Return of Service re Giant Food Stores, LLC, #12 Attachment 12 - Return of Service re Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, #13 Attachment 13 - Third Amended Complaint by Interlineation, #14 Attachment 14 - Fourth Amended Complaint by Interlineation, #15 Exhibit A - Fourth Amended Complaint by Interlineation, #16 Exhibit B - Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc's Answer, #17 Exhibit C - Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.'s Motion to Fix Venue for Claims Related to Imerys's Bankruptcy filed in USBC for the District of Delaware, #18 Exhibit D - State Court Docket Sheet, #19 AP 19-126 WIL Docket Sheet, #20 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/23/2019: #21 Compact Disc Cover Sheet) (kns, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bekele et al v. Giant Food Stores, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Greenville
Represented By: Dori Ann Persky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tsion Bekele
Represented By: Dori Ann Persky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc
Represented By: Kristen Siracusa Eustis
Represented By: Robin Silver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc America, Inc.
Represented By: Joel D Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc.
Represented By: Joel D Newport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant Food Stores, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?