Michels v. Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Timothy Michels
Defendant: Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01526
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: George Levi Russell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimof First Amended Complaint by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1)(Evelius, Paul)
July 10, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Surreply by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Evelius, Paul)
July 9, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION to Remand to Circuit Court filed by Timothy Michels. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand to Circuit Court)(Dolina, Thomas)
July 9, 2019 Filing 21 QC NOTICE: #20 Response in Opposition, filed by Timothy Michels was filed using the incorrect event. **Please refile document under the "Responses and Replies" category, select the "Reply to Response to Motion" event and link to the original motion. The document has been marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
July 9, 2019 Filing 20 (FILED IN ERROR - INCORRECT EVENT) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand , #18 Response in Opposition to Motion to Remand to Circuit Court by Timothy Michels. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Reply to Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand)(Dolina, Thomas) Modified on 7/9/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company.(Evelius, Paul)
June 25, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand to Circuit Court filed by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Evelius, Paul)
June 25, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint (Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint) by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company.(Evelius, Paul)
June 11, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Timothy Michels.(Dolina, Thomas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand by Timothy Michels(Dolina, Thomas)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company, filed by Timothy Michels. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Dolina, Thomas)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #3 Complaint by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company.(Potter, Jason)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company re #5 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Potter, Jason)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Potter, Jason)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 (FILED IN ERROR - REFILED) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Evelius, Paul) Modified on 5/30/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
May 30, 2019 Filing 9 (FILED IN ERROR - REFILED) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Evelius, Paul) Modified on 5/30/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 QC NOTICE: #7 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **When filing a two part motion, please select both the dismiss and summary judgment events. The motion has been terminated, marked FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 (FILED IN ERROR - DISMISS AND SJ SHOULD BE SELECTED) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claimor Alternatively for Summary Judgment by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Potter, Jason) Modified on 5/30/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Evelius, Paul)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Levi Russell, III on 5/23/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 23, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge George Levi Russell, III. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (3-4) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR BALTIMORE COUNTY. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 30 days as to Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 5/23/2019 (hmls, Deputy Clerk).
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company filed by Timothy Michels.(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Chesapeake Risk Solutions, Inc., Corporate Parent iCubed Ventures, LLC for Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company.(Evelius, Paul)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Baltimore County Circuit Court, case number C-03-CV-19-000111. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8028477), filed by Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Evelius, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Michels v. Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Michels
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Dolina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chesapeake Employers' Insurance Company
Represented By: Jason Robert Potter
Represented By: Paul Francis Evelius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?