Perdue Farms Incorporated et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Plaintiff: Perdue Foods LLC and Perdue Farms Incorporated
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 1:2019cv01550
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Ellen L Hollander
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Joseph G Finnerty, III. Directing attorney Joseph G Finnerty, III to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 6/28/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIUH LLC, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Tarver, Darryl)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Scheduling Conference Call for July 22, 2019, at 4:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/27/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 25, 2019 Deficiency Notice as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, Pa. -- Your Local Rule 103.3 disclosure statement has not been filed. The Statement must be filed by 7/2/2019 (bas, Deputy Clerk)
June 24, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Joseph G. Finnerty III (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8088158.) by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Attachments: #1 Attachment Applicant's U.S. Court Admissions and Dates of Admission)(Tarver, Darryl)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Complaint, by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(Tarver, Darryl)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/30/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time)(Tarver, Darryl)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/30/2019. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 THE ABOVE DOCUMENTS (4-5) ARE COPIES OF ORIGINAL PAPERS FILED IN THE CIRCUIT COURT FOR WICOMICO COUNTY. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued 21 days as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Jury Trial Demand by Perdue Farms Incorporated, Perdue Foods LLC(bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, filed by Perdue Farms Incorporated, Perdue Foods LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Case Information Report)(bas, Deputy Clerk)
May 28, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl Louis Tarver on behalf of National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (Tarver, Darryl)
May 24, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Ellen L. Hollander. jnls, Deputy Clerk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 INTERPLEADER by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA identifying Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc., Corporate Parent AIUH LLC, Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.(O Day, Michael)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Wicomico County, case number C-22-CV-19-000152. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8033621), filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit 1 to State Court Complaint, #4 Exhibit 2 to State Court Complaint, #5 Exhibit 3 to State Court Complaint, #6 Exhibit 4 to State Court Complaint, #7 Exhibit 5 to State Court Complaint, #8 Exhibit 6 to State Court Complaint, #9 Exhibit 7 to State Court Complaint, #10 Exhibit 8 to State Court Complaint, #11 Exhibit 9 to State Court Complaint, #12 Exhibit 10 to State Court Complaint, #13 Summons State Court Summons, #14 Civil Cover Sheet for State Court)(O Day, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perdue Farms Incorporated et al v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Represented By: Michael P O Day
Represented By: Darryl Louis Tarver
Represented By: Joseph G Finnerty, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perdue Foods LLC
Represented By: Stephen Edward Marshall
Represented By: Brian J Healy
Represented By: Thomasina Esmee Poirot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Perdue Farms Incorporated
Represented By: Stephen Edward Marshall
Represented By: Brian J Healy
Represented By: Thomasina Esmee Poirot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?