Elephant Insurance Company v. Cunningham et al

Plaintiff: Elephant Insurance Company
Defendant: Danielle Carter, Tomika Watson, Joseph Dukes, Yalmikia Edmonds, Geico Casualty Company, Yazmine Tozwell, Diane Rodgers, Eugene Rodgers, Kathryn Vaughn and Tiffany Cunningham
Case Number: 1:2019cv01652
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 QC NOTICE: #13 Affidavit of Service filed by Elephant Insurance Company was filed incorrectly. **Incorrect event was selected. Please refile using the event under Service of Process: Summons Returned Executed. It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (bmhs, Deputy Clerk)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 (FILED IN ERROR) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Yalmikia Edmonds on 06/29/2019, filed by Elephant Insurance Company.(Wolf, Christopher) Modified on 7/16/2019 (bmhs, Deputy Clerk).
July 9, 2019 Filing 12 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Geico Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent GEICO Corporation, Corporate Parent Geico Indemnity Company for Geico Casualty Company.(Edwards, Sean)
July 9, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Geico Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure)(Edwards, Sean)
July 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elephant Insurance Company. Yalmikia Edmonds served on 6/15/2019, answer due 7/8/2019.(Wolf, Christopher)
July 1, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elephant Insurance Company. Yazmine Tozwell served on 6/15/2019, answer due 7/8/2019.(Wolf, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elephant Insurance Company. Joseph Dukes served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019.(Wolf, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elephant Insurance Company. Tiffany Cunningham served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019.(Wolf, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elephant Insurance Company. Diane Rodgers served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019.(Wolf, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elephant Insurance Company. Eugene Rodgers served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019.(Wolf, Christopher)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Elephant Insurance Company. Kathryn Vaughn served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019.(Wolf, Christopher)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued 21 days as to Danielle Carter, Tiffany Cunningham, Joseph Dukes, Yalmikia Edmonds, Geico Casualty Company, Diane Rodgers, Eugene Rodgers, Yazmine Tozwell, Kathryn Vaughn, Tomika Watson.(ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Elephant Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Admiral Group for Elephant Insurance Company.(Wolf, Christopher)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8052094.), filed by Elephant Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Tiffany Cunningham, #3 Summons Danielle Carter, #4 Summons Tomika Watson, #5 Summons Eugene Rodgers, #6 Summons Diane Rodgers, #7 Summons Yalmikia Edmonds, #8 Summons Kathryn Vaughn, #9 Summons Joseph Dukes, #10 Summons Yazmine Tozwell, #11 Summons Geico Casualty Company)(Wolf, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elephant Insurance Company v. Cunningham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danielle Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tomika Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph Dukes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yalmikia Edmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geico Casualty Company
Represented By: Sean P Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yazmine Tozwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diane Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Cunningham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elephant Insurance Company
Represented By: Craig David Roswell
Represented By: Christopher D Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?