World Business Lenders, LLC v. G9, Medicare and Medicate
Plaintiff: World Business Lenders, LLC
Defendant: G9, Medicare and Medicate a/k/a, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid, G9, Medicare and Medicate and Centers for Medicare and Medicaid
Case Number: 1:2019cv01657
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: Richard D Bennett
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2019 Filing 11 QC NOTICE: #10 Motion to Set Aside Judgment, filed by G9, Medicare and Medicate, G7, Medicare and Medicate was filed incorrectly. **THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (RDB-19-1655). It has been noted as FILED IN ERROR, and the document link has been disabled. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 10 [FILED IN ERROR] MOTION to Set Aside Judgment (Motion for Relief from Final Judgments) by G9, Medicare and Medicate, G7, Medicare and Medicate (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01655-RDB, 1:19-cv-01657-RDB(Lazerow, Alan) Modified on 7/17/2019 (krs, Deputy Clerk).
June 19, 2019 THIS IS A CONSOLIDATED CASE. PLEASE DO NOT ELECTRONICALLY FILE OR SPREAD TEXT IN THIS CASE. ALL SUBSEQUENT PLEADINGS ARE TO BE ELECTRONICALLY FILED ONLY IN THE LEAD CASE (RDB-19-1655). (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting #4 Motion to Consolidate Cases RDB-19-1655 and RDB-19-1657; designating RDB-19-1655 as the lead case. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/19/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE re #6 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by G9, Medicare and Medicate.(Lazerow, Alan)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Enlargement of Time. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/17/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge Richard D. Bennett on 6/10/2019. (hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT/PETITION for Enforcement of a Foreign Judgment against G9, Medicare and Medicate filed by World Business Lenders, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(hmls, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2019 Case Assigned to Judge Richard D. Bennett. (ko, Deputy Clerk)
June 5, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by G9, Medicare and Medicate a/k/a, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Lazerow, Alan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Extension of Time by G9, Medicare and Medicate a/k/a, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lazerow, Alan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Local Rule 103.5 Filing of State Court Papers(Lazerow, Alan)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court for Baltimore County, Maryland, case number C-03-JG-19-001183., filed by G9, Medicare and Medicate a/k/a, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Petition for Enforcement of a Foreign Judgment, #4 Exhibit Petition for Enforcement of a Foreign Judgment Ex. A)(Lazerow, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: World Business Lenders, LLC v. G9, Medicare and Medicate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: World Business Lenders, LLC
Represented By: Ibrahim Abdul Moiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G9, Medicare and Medicate a/k/a, Centers for Medicare and Medicaid
Represented By: Alan Carl Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G9, Medicare and Medicate
Represented By: Alan Carl Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centers for Medicare and Medicaid
Represented By: Alan Carl Lazerow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?