Asbestos Workers Local 24 Medical Fund et al v. Z & E Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Matthew Stillitano, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Medical Fund, Wilfredo Mata, Ronald S. Shegogue, Ken Graves, Brian S. Cavey, Scott Grant, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Apprenticeship Fund, Kevin P. Orchard, Rick Schmid, Steve Pumphrey, Mike Moneymaker, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Pension Fund, Robert S. McCourt, Jonathan Potter and Forrest Warman
Defendant: Z&E Enterprises Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01743
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Maryland
Presiding Judge: J Mark Coulson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER: ECF No. 15 is GRANTED. Accordingly, ECF No. 10 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/6/2019. (daws, Chambers)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Other Relief Notice of withdrawal of motion to dismiss for insufficient service by Z&E Enterprises Inc.(Brennan, John)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MARGINAL ORDER approving #13 STIPULATION to Accept Service of Summons and Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 8/2/2019. (ol, Deputy Clerk)
August 1, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Accept Service of Summons and Complaint by Asbestos Workers Local 24 Apprenticeship Fund, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Medical Fund, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Pension Fund, Brian S. Cavey, Scott Grant, Ken Graves, Wilfredo Mata, Robert S. McCourt, Mike Moneymaker, Kevin P. Orchard, Jonathan Potter, Steve Pumphrey, Rick Schmid, Ronald S. Shegogue, Matthew Stillitano, Forrest Warman(Lin, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c), all parties have voluntarily consented to have Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson conduct all further proceedings in this case, including trial and entry of final judgment, and conduct all post-judgment proceedings, with direct review by the Fourth Circuit Court of Appeals, if an appeal is filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/23/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER CANCELLING Show Cause Hearing re: #5 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/23/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 22, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for insufficient service of process by Z&E Enterprises Inc.(Brennan, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re: #6 Consent to Magistrate Judge. Asbestos Workers Local 24 Medical Fund et al must correct the following error(s):**Pursuant to the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures, consent forms are to be filed with the event 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge located in Other Filings >Other Documents >25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 FILED IN ERROR - Consent to Magistrate Judge (Lin, Andrew) Modified on 7/11/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER directing Asbestos Workers Local 24 Apprenticeship Fund, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Medical Fund, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Pension Fund, Brian S. Cavey, Scott Grant, Ken Graves, Wilfredo Mata, Robert S. McCourt, Mike Moneymaker, Kevin P. Orchard, Jonathan Potter, Steve Pumphrey, Rick Schmid, Ronald S. Shegogue, Matthew Stillitano, Forrest Warman or counsel for Asbestos Workers Local 24 Apprenticeship Fund, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Medical Fund, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Pension Fund, Brian S. Cavey, Scott Grant, Ken Graves, Wilfredo Mata, Robert S. McCourt, Mike Moneymaker, Kevin P. Orchard, Jonathan Potter, Steve Pumphrey, Rick Schmid, Ronald S. Shegogue, Matthew Stillitano, Forrest Warman to show cause for failure to comply with #Standing Order 2018-04. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/30/2019 02:00 PM in (proceed to the Clerk's Office to determine the location of the hearing) before the Chambers Judge. This Order shall be vacated if Asbestos Workers Local 24 Apprenticeship Fund, et al files a consent or declination prior to the show cause hearing date. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 7/1/2019. (jnls, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued 21 days as to Z&E Enterprises Inc.(ds3, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 6/14/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Asbestos Workers Local 24 Apprenticeship Fund, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Medical Fund, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Pension Fund, Brian S. Cavey, Scott Grant, Ken Graves, Wilfredo Mata, Robert S. McCourt, Mike Moneymaker, Kevin P. Orchard, Jonathan Potter, Steve Pumphrey, Rick Schmid, Ronald S. Shegogue, Matthew Stillitano, Forrest Warman or counsel for Asbestos Workers Local 24 Apprenticeship Fund, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Medical Fund, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Pension Fund, Brian S. Cavey, Scott Grant, Ken Graves, Wilfredo Mata, Robert S. McCourt, Mike Moneymaker, Kevin P. Orchard, Jonathan Potter, Steve Pumphrey, Rick Schmid, Ronald S. Shegogue, Matthew Stillitano, Forrest Warman are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2018-04, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 6/28/2019. (ds3, Deputy Clerk)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Z & E Enterprises, Inc. d/b/a Mid-Atlantic Construction Group ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8072422.), filed by Rick Schmid, Kevin P. Orchard, Ronald S. Shegogue, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Medical Fund, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Apprenticeship Fund, Ken Graves, Jonathan Potter, Scott Grant, Mike Moneymaker, Steve Pumphrey, Wilfredo Mata, Matthew Stillitano, Asbestos Workers Local 24 Pension Fund, Brian S. Cavey, Forrest Warman, Robert S. McCourt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Lin, Andrew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/14/2019: #10 Complaint #12 Complaint) (jnls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 6/14/2019 (jnls, Deputy Clerk).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Maryland District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asbestos Workers Local 24 Medical Fund et al v. Z & E Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Stillitano
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asbestos Workers Local 24 Medical Fund
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilfredo Mata
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald S. Shegogue
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ken Graves
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian S. Cavey
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Grant
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asbestos Workers Local 24 Apprenticeship Fund
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin P. Orchard
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Schmid
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Pumphrey
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Moneymaker
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asbestos Workers Local 24 Pension Fund
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. McCourt
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Potter
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest Warman
Represented By: Andrew K Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Z&E Enterprises Inc.
Represented By: John Terrance Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?